Crabtree et al v. Marriott International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Betty Robinson-Harris and Matthew Crabtree
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv03779
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Roger W Titus
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1453
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED ORDER that all proceedings in this case are suspended pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML)on the motion to transfer and consolidate. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 1/18/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Other Relief Unopposed Motion for Entry of Stipulated Order Suspending Proceedings Pending Decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keteltas, Gilbert)
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David Taylor Rudolph. Directing attorney David Taylor Rudolph to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 1/17/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David T. Rudolph (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7787700.) by Matthew Crabtree, Betty Robinson-Harris(Joshi, Cary)
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael L Murphy. Directing attorney Michael L Murphy to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/8/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Benjamin L Bailey. Attorney Benjamin L Bailey will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 1/8/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John J Roddy. Directing attorney John J Roddy to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/8/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jason L Lichtman. Directing attorney Jason L Lichtman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/8/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael L. Murphy (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7763179.) by Matthew Crabtree, Betty Robinson-Harris(Joshi, Cary)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin L. Bailey (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7763171.) by Matthew Crabtree, Betty Robinson-Harris(Joshi, Cary)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Roddy (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7763158.) by Matthew Crabtree, Betty Robinson-Harris(Joshi, Cary)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jason L. Lichtman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7763134.) by Matthew Crabtree, Betty Robinson-Harris(Joshi, Cary)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lisa M Ghannoum. Directing attorney Lisa M Ghannoum to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel R Warren. Directing attorney Daniel R Warren to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lisa M. Ghannoum (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7737986.) by Marriott International, Inc.(Keteltas, Gilbert)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel R. Warren (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7737985.) by Marriott International, Inc.(Keteltas, Gilbert)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc. (Keteltas, Gilbert)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilbert S Keteltas on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Keteltas, Gilbert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Marriott International, Inc.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Roger W Titus. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marriott International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7715790.), filed by Matthew Crabtree, Betty Robinson-Harris. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joshi, Cary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crabtree et al v. Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Robinson-Harris
Represented By: Cary L. Joshi
Represented By: John J Roddy
Represented By: Michael L Murphy
Represented By: Jason L Lichtman
Represented By: David Taylor Rudolph
Represented By: Benjamin L Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Crabtree
Represented By: Cary L. Joshi
Represented By: John J Roddy
Represented By: Michael L Murphy
Represented By: Jason L Lichtman
Represented By: David Taylor Rudolph
Represented By: Benjamin L Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?