Delta T, LLC v. Dan's Fan City, Inc.

Plaintiff: Delta T, LLC d/b/a Big Ass Fan Company and Delta T, LLC
Defendant: Dan's Fan City, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv03858
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING pre-motion telephone conference call on February 19, 2019, at 5:30 PM to discuss options for targeted discovery in connection with Defendant's proposed motion to dismiss for lack of venue AND DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties, as discussed in this morning's telephone conference call with counsel. I direct the parties to confer among themselves and submit a brief status report by 2/15/19 outlining plans for narrow discovery. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/8/2019. (sb2s, Chambers)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING pre-motion telephone conference call on February 8, 2019, at 11:00AM AND DIRECTING Defendant's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/22/2019. (sb2, Chambers)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Lewis, Joseph)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Dan's Fan City, Inc. (Lewis, Joseph)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D Lewis on behalf of Dan's Fan City, Inc. (Lewis, Joseph)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry J Saidman on behalf of Delta T, LLC (Saidman, Perry)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Delta T, LLC. Dan's Fan City, Inc. served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019.(Schwaber, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Delta T, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Big Ass Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate Goldberg Lindsay & Co., LLC, Other Affiliate Lindsay Goldberg for Delta T, LLC.(Schwaber, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #6 Local Rule 103.3 filed by Delta T, LLC was filed incorrectly. The name of the corporate parent/affiliate were not entered. Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings Other Documents Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted by CMECF. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to Dan's Fan City, Inc.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 (ENTERED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL) Local Rule 103.3(Schwaber, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/20/2018 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Delta T, LLC re #1 Complaint, Proposed Summons (Schwaber, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/17/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Delta T, LLC was filed incorrectly. Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement was filed incorrectly. Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings Other Documents Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Delta T, LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dan's Fan City, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7730526.), filed by Delta T, LLC d/b/a Big Ass Fan Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Attachment Local Rule 103.3)(Schwaber, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta T, LLC v. Dan's Fan City, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta T, LLC d/b/a Big Ass Fan Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M Schwaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta T, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M Schwaber
Represented By: Perry J Saidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan's Fan City, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph D Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?