Reynolds v. Ward et al
Plaintiff: Samuel C. Reynolds, Jr.
Defendant: BWW Law Group, LLC, Net Work Funding, LP, J.P. Morgan Chase Company, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Deutsche Bank National Trust and Carrie M. Ward
Case Number: 8:2018cv03921
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Samuel C. Reynolds, Jr. BWW Law Group, LLC served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019; Carrie M. Ward served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Company, leave to file their Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/4/2019. (cm 02/05/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by J.P. Morgan Chase Company re #1 Complaint,, of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss (Diemer, Mary)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Defendant leave to file the Proposed Motion. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/30/2019. (cm 01/31/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 Case Management Conference held on 1/29/2019 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-2B.) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by J.P. Morgan Chase Company identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Chase Company.(Diemer, Mary)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary S Diemer on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase Company (Diemer, Mary)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to Parties scheduling a telephone status conference for January 29, 2019 at 2:00PM re #7 Notice of Intent to File a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/17/2019. (cm 01/17/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc. for Deutsche Bank National Trust.(Glass, Daniel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Glass, Daniel)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank National Trust, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, Notice of Intent to File Motion (Glass, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to BWW Law Group, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust, J.P. Morgan Chase Company, Net Work Funding, LP, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Carrie M. Ward.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Provide a Summons for BWW Law Group, LLC to the Clerk and Provide Service Copies of the Complaint to the Clerk re #1 Complaint,, filed by Samuel C. Reynolds, Jr.. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/2/2019. (c/m to pla 1/3/2019 rss, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Supplemental (Corrections) to #1 Complaint, filed by Samuel C. Reynolds, Jr. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE (Proposed Summons) by Samuel C. Reynolds, Jr re #1 Complaint. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/21/2018. (c/m 12/21/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BWW Law Group, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust, J.P. Morgan Chase Company, Net Work Funding, LP, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Carrie M. Ward ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 846370.), filed by Samuel C. Reynolds, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summary Report, #3 Claim of Relief, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 7A, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 8A, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Ward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWW Law Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Net Work Funding, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Company
Represented By: Mary S Diemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel A Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust
Represented By: Daniel A Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie M. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel C. Reynolds, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?