Gillis et al v. Household Finance Corporation III et al

Plaintiff: Alfonzo Gillis and Sandra Gillis
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Caliber Home Loans, Inc, Household Financial Corporation III, Household Finance Corporation III and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv03923
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carry, Alfred)
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Household Finance Corporation III (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Troost, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Patterson, Emily)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brian E Pumphrey. Directing attorney Brian E Pumphrey to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 1/11/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lyle Kossis. Directing attorney Lyle Kossis to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/4/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Household Finance Corporation III, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Carry, Alfred)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Household Finance Corporation III identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Finance Corporation, Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc. for Household Finance Corporation III.(Troost, Thomas)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Troost on behalf of Household Finance Corporation III (Troost, Thomas)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 12/21/2018. (jw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patterson, Emily)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 12/20/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Other Affiliate SPS Holding Corporation for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Carry, Alfred)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lyle D. Kossis by Caliber Home Loans, Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order). The fee has already been paid.(Patterson, Emily)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lyle D. Kossis (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7742611.) by Caliber Home Loans, Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patterson, Emily)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian E. Pumphrey (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7742364.) by Caliber Home Loans, Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patterson, Emily)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Caliber Home Loans, Inc identifying Other Affiliate LSF6 Service Operations, LLC, Other Affiliate LSF6 Mid-Servicer Holdings, LLC for Caliber Home Loans, Inc.(Patterson, Emily)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Michele Patterson on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc (Patterson, Emily)
December 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2018 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0416-7740336(Carry, Alfred)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 456575V., filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex.1 - Complaint, #3 Ex.2 - All Pleadings and Process, #4 Ex.3 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Ex.4 - Consent of Household Finance Corporation III, #6 Ex.5 - Consent of Caliber Home Loans, Inc.)(Carry, Alfred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillis et al v. Household Finance Corporation III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonzo Gillis
Represented By: Phillip R Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Gillis
Represented By: Phillip R Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: John Alexander Nader
Represented By: Alfred Dumetz Carry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc
Represented By: Emily Michele Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Household Financial Corporation III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Household Finance Corporation III
Represented By: Thomas Troost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Michele Patterson
Represented By: Brian E Pumphrey
Represented By: Lyle D Kossis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?