Allen v. RBC Capital Markets, LLC

Plaintiff: Melissa Allen
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Warren Bischoff and John Gerold
Case Number: 8:2018cv03971
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by RBC Capital Markets, LLC.(Flood, John)
February 12, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Melissa Allen.(Carter, Adam)
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Melissa Allen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Adam)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by RBC Capital Markets, LLC.(Flood, John)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Melissa Allen. (Carter, Adam)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Melissa Allen. (Carter, Adam)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by RBC Capital Markets, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Flood, John)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by RBC Capital Markets, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flood, John)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by RBC Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC.(Flood, John)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Melissa Allen (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4)(Carter, Adam)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #3 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by RBC Capital Markets, LLC.(Flood, John)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Melissa Allen (Carter, Adam)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 1/2/2019. (jw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by RBC Capital Markets, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flood, John)
December 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scott Oswald on behalf of Melissa Allen (Oswald, Robert)
December 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Augustine Carter on behalf of Melissa Allen (Carter, Adam)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 12/27/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Byron Flood on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC (Flood, John)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Montgomery County Maryland, case number 457953-V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7749862), filed by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit C-2, #11 Exhibit D)(Flood, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: John Byron Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gerold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Allen
Represented By: Adam Augustine Carter
Represented By: Robert Scott Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?