Naves v. Prince George's County

Plaintiff: anita naves
Defendant: Prince George's County
Case Number: 8:2018cv03974
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Consent to Magistrate Judge. Please correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #6 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 2/22/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Hopkins, John) Modified on 2/22/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Anita Naves to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/22/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Anita Naves files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 1/11/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/15/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/27/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Anita Naves or counsel for Anita Naves are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/10/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #2 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Anita Naves, was filed using the wrong event. **Re-file your Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis using the Civil Event - Motions - Proceed in Forma Pauperis. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. #1 Complaint filed by Anita Naves was filed with the following attachments missing - Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by anita naves(Hopkins, John) Modified on 12/27/2018 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against anita naves, filed by anita naves.(Hopkins, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naves v. Prince George's County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: anita naves
Represented By: John Allen Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince George's County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?