Lindauer v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

Plaintiff: Susan Lindauer
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00039
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued 21 days as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing clerk to issue summons as provided with the complaint; counsel shall take all necessary steps to effectuate service of the summons and complaint to Defendant. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/26/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #8 Order filed by Susan Lindauer.(McKnight, Thomas)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER denying #9 Motion for Emergency Rule 65 Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/12/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #9 Motion for Emergency Rule 65 Temporary Restraining Order filed by Susan Lindauer filed on 2/12/2019 was deficient. See attachment for details. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Emergency Rule 65 Temporary Restraining Order by Susan Lindauer (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that plaintiff is Granted Twenty-One (21) days to respond to this Order; failure to respond will result in dismissal of the complaint without further notice and without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/1/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence re: Approval to File a Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Chang, Edward)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Win-Teh Chang on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Chang, Edward)
January 26, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Counsel by Susan Lindauer(McKnight, Thomas) Modified on 1/28/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, filed by Susan Lindauer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit "B", #8 Exhibit "C", #9 Exhibit I)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/8/2019. (c/s 1/8/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Susan Lindauer. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637033644.), filed by Susan Lindauer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit "B", #8 Exhibit "C", #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindauer v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Edward Win-Teh Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lindauer
Represented By: Thomas Kerns McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?