Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. v. Cumberland et al

Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Patsy D. Cumberland and Richard Dodd
Case Number: 8:2019cv00067
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.. Richard Dodd served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019.(Schreiber, Martin)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Patsy D. Cumberland, Richard Dodd.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Judge George Levi Russell, III no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ditech Holding Corp. for Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc..(Schreiber, Martin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and Summonses to be stamped by Clerk (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Schreiber, Martin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7768154.), filed by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D)(Schreiber, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. v. Cumberland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patsy D. Cumberland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Martin Harold Schreiber, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?