Johnson v. Small et al.
Plaintiff: Ieasha Johnson
Defendant: Ronald Small and Salem Carriers Incorporated
Case Number: 8:2019cv00089
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued 21 days as to Salem Carriers Incorporated. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER re #18 Motion for Extension of Time; Status Report now due: 6/26/2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/8/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2019 Filing 19 Supplemental to #15 Amended Complaint filed by Ieasha Johnson Red Line Complaint (Attachments: #1 ECS15)(Hatfield, Peter)
February 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time Amending Scheduling Order by Salem Carriers, Inc., Ronald Small(Miles, Gerard)
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 Defendants' ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by Ronald Small, Salem Carriers, Inc..(Miles, Gerard)
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 Status Conference held on 2/1/2019 before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ats, Chambers)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ronald Small, filed by Ieasha Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Summons)(Hatfield, Peter)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ieasha Johnson (Hatfield, Peter)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ieasha Johnson (Hatfield, Peter)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ieasha Johnson (Hatfield, Peter)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 Telephone Conference Call for February 1, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/23/19. (lmys, Chambers)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Disclosure Pursuant to Federal Rules and Procedures 26(a)(1) by Ieasha Johnson(Hatfield, Peter)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 Correspondence re: Statement Concerning Removal (Miles, Gerard)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ronald Small identifying Other Affiliate Great West Casualty Company for Ronald Small.(Miles, Gerard)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Order Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 6/26/2019.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/16/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Ronald Small.(Miles, Gerard)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/10/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/9/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Ronald Small (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince Georges County, Maryland, case number CAL18-44010. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637112150), filed by Ronald Small. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Case Information Report, #4 Letter to Clerk, #5 Letter to Clerk)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Small et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ieasha Johnson
Represented By: Peter Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Small
Represented By: Gerard F. Miles, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Carriers Incorporated
Represented By: Gerard F. Miles, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?