Small El-Bey v. Cerere

Plaintiff: Deborah Joan Small El-Bey
Defendant: Andy Cerere
Case Number: 8:2019cv00186
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Referring Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RETURN PLEADING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(c/m 2/27/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Dismissing #1 Complaint as moot. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/1/2019. (c/m 2/1/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/1/2019. (c/m 2/1/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andy Cerere, filed by Deborah Joan Small El-Bey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment, #3 Envelope)(km4s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Small El-Bey v. Cerere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Joan Small El-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Cerere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?