Kidwell v. OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC et al

Plaintiff: Patra Kidwell
Defendant: Howard N Biermann, BWW Law Group LLC and OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00446
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Patra Kidwell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC, BWW Law Group LLC, Howard N Bierman (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loomba, Namrata) Modified filers on 4/10/2019 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
April 2, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Namrata Loomba on behalf of OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC (Loomba, Namrata)
April 2, 2019 Filing 28 QC NOTICE: A certificate of service indicating how service was made on parties not receiving electronic notification has not been filed for #23 Notice of Appearance filed by OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC. Please file it immediately upon receipt. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2019 Filing 27 Consent to Magistrate Judge (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RETURN PLEADING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document) (c/h/d 4/2/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2019 Filing 26 Supplemental Exhibits to #24 Amended Complaint filed by Patra Kidwell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I) (Exhibit E is missing) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BWW Law Group LLC, Howard N Biermann, and OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC, filed by Patra Kidwell. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Namrata Loomba on behalf of OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC (Loomba, Namrata)
March 19, 2019 Filing 22 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Chang, Edward)
March 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Win-Teh Chang on behalf of OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC (Chang, Edward)
March 18, 2019 Filing 20 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Cohen, Matthew)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #18 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/15/2019. (c/m 3/15/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/15/2019. (c/m 3/15/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/15/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint by 3/29/2019 and Setting Filing Deadlines. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/15/2019. (c/m to pla 3/15/2019 rss, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2019 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-2B.) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Intent to File Motion to Remand by Patra Kidwell (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER/NOTICE rescheduling the Rule 16 Case Management Conference to March 15, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/1/2019. (c/m 3/1/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #11 Motion to Remand; Directing Kidwell to file a Notice of Intent to File a Motion by March 5, 2019; Directing a Pre-Motion Conference was previously scheduled for March 7, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/26/2019. (c/m 2/27/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #9 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC.(Chang, Edward)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 Removal Notification Letter sent to Pro Se Plaintiff. (cm 0/20/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/20/2019. (cm 02/20/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC identifying Corporate Parent OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC for OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC.(Chang, Edward)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence re: Permission to File a Motion to Dismiss (Chang, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Remand by Patra Kidwell (Attachments: #1 EXH A, #2 EXH B) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE scheduling a Rule 16 Case Management Conference for March 7, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/19/2019. (c/m 2/19/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by BWW Law Group LLC, Howard N Biermann Notice of Intent to File a Motion (Cohen, Matthew)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BWW Law Group LLC (Cohen, Matthew)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D Cohen on behalf of BWW Law Group LLC, Howard N Biermann (Cohen, Matthew)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/14/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 2/15/19)
February 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL 19-00808. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7841783), filed by OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Chang, Edward) Modified on 2/14/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kidwell v. OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard N Biermann
Represented By: Matthew D Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWW Law Group LLC
Represented By: Matthew D Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Edward Win-Teh Chang
Represented By: Namrata Loomba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patra Kidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?