Love v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Petitioner: Beneda Alize Love
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 8:2019cv00468
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 8:1255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #6 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 3/13/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Beneda Alize Love to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/26/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Beneda Alize Love files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 3/11/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 2/21/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Beneda Alize Love or counsel for Beneda Alize Love are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/7/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin G Messer on behalf of Beneda Alize Love (Messer, Benjamin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7844238.), filed by Beneda Alize Love. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to USCIS, #3 Summons to U.S. Attorney, #4 Summons to Attorney General)(Messer, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Beneda Alize Love
Represented By: Benjamin G Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?