Sean Silver et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sean Silver and Aline Baca
Defendant: Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC, Marriott International, Inc., . and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv00502
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 29 MDL Certified Transfer Order Transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Amanda Arnold, Edward Baker, Brad Barringer, Kiana Belcher, Kevin Berry, Susan Beverley, Douglas Blake, Michael Blicher, Carol Blood, Robert Bluestone, Tanesha Boradgiak, Michael Bunker, Brenda Burr, Yvette Butler, Shelia Canipe, Deana Cannon, Catherine Carlberg, Ruthanne Carpenter, Cheryl Castor, Michael Castor, Crystal Chambers, Kathleen Christensen, Prudence Concert-White, Curtis Cummings, Mary Ellen Davey, Christopher Davies, Dorothy Davis, Karen Davis, Kenneth Davis, Graves De Armond, Cynthia Deese, May Desrochers, Scott Dias, Sami Difuntorum, Jonathan Dodart, Julie Duchsherer, Mark Duffey, Gretchen Ehle, Vance Edward Eichelberger, Carla Engle, Barbara Erickson, Michelle Featherstone, Ronald Michael Feschak, Nathan Finney, Janice Frazier-Scott, Lisa Frederickson, Michael Freeland, Lisa Fritz, Marlon Gaines, Steve Gajewski, Laurene Gallway, Eric Gault, Betsy Gentry, Scott Gideon, John Gilliland, Jon Goldberg, Angela Gresh, Latausha Griffin, Jernard Griggs, Edward Hanley, Charles Hanson, Sheila Harrison, Danielle Hayes, Phyllis Hecker, Amber Helton, Jeri Holt-Minter, Virginia Howell, Donna Hughes, Patricia Huizar, Tamika Jackson, Kyle Jaski, Monica Johnson, Nikole Jordan, Mary Jo Jurey, Robert Kaiser, Lucy Karl, Jeffrey Kemp, Linda Kite, Joan Knudson, Sarah Korwan, Ronald Kotz, Ellen Kowitt, Maretta Leitka, Rik Lewis, Beverly Louk, Anthony Malfi, Patrice Matthews, Olivia May, Susan Mcintosh, David Melendez, Holger Meyer, Debra Michaud, Jack Milam, Judy Mills, Chalise Morris, Chris Morris, David Moyer, Susan Mullins, Dorothy Odie, Jeffrey Oelhafen, Christina Olsen, Carol Ostapchuk, Steven Owens, Asim Padh, Justin Palmer, Darrel Parris, Janlisa Parris, Curtis Payne, Lawrence Perlmutter, Jeninne Pitts, Christopher Pratt, Burnease Ragin, Jeffrey Rahn, Michael Raimondi, Karen Rambat, Michael Rapp, Kumar Rashad, Beverly Ricks, Selma Rodriguez, Ruth Patricia Rosados, Andrew Rose, Joel Rosson, Mark Rotondi, Deidrinelle Rouse, Karen Russell, Richard Ryans, Rick Sabath, Bruce Sanders, Anne Santo, Anne Savarese, Vincent Savarese, Sonja Scott, David Secrist, Shawn Seeley, Tonekia Showell, Tamika Simmonds, John Simmons, Edward Siperstein, Lee Slagle, Dale Smith, Shane Somerville, Angela Sonnier, David Sparks, Kent Spence, Jody Stephens, Rhonda Stevens, Theresa Sykes, Debra Talley, Peter Tapling, Joe Taylor, Gordon Thomas, Joseph Throneberry, Beverly Tookey, Ricardo Vaquer, Edgar Vaynshteyn, Vickie Vetter, Felicia Wallace, John Waller, Kevin Walls, Jean Waskiewicz, Curtis Weaver, Ira Weintraub, Janet Wender, Marjorie Wheeler, Doreen Whelan, Debra Whiddon, Melissa White, Charles Williams, Gerald Williams, Linda Winsey, Stacey Wollman, Dennis Wooldridge, Maria Wooten, Ronzella Wright-Loftly, Jason Young, Julie Young, Melissa Yurkanin, Shaun Yurtkuran Plaintiffs' Interim Coordinating Counsel's Proposed CMO Regarding Model Leadship Applications for the Consumer Track Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Pizzirusso, James)
March 19, 2019 Filing 27 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 4 transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Zeldes on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Zeldes, Helen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben Travis on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Travis, Ben)
March 1, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy C Johnsgard on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Johnsgard, Amy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 23 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 3 Transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2019 Filing 22 Correspondence from Clerk to counsel re: transfer of MDL case. (c/e-m 2/25/19 with ECF 3 in PWG 19-md-2879 (Order)) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-10390. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2879, transferring case to USDC, District of Maryland and assigned to Honorable Paul W. Grimm. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO SUSPEND PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION BY JPML #18 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Decision by JPML filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Matthias in Support of Stipulation to Suspend Proceedings Pending Decision by JPML, #2 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation to Suspend Proceedings Pending Decision by JPML)(Matthias, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-10034 DSF(MRWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early and Judge John F. Walter to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-10390 DSF(MRWx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
December 29, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of (1) Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings; and (2) Petition to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, List of Pending Actions)(Matthias, Michael)
December 29, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-10490-AB-AGR, 2:18-cv-10034-DSF-MRW, 2:18-cv-10173-DSF-MRW, 2:18-cv-10234-JFW-MRW, 2:18-cv-10324-CJC-AS, and 5:18-cv-02545-DSF-MRW (Matthias, Michael)
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Michael R. Matthias Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Matthias, Michael)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael R Matthias counsel for Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. Adding Michael R. Matthias as counsel of record for Marriott International, Inc. and Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc. and Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Attorney Michael R Matthias added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael R Matthias added to party Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC(pty:dft))(Matthias, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO SUSPEND PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION BY JPML #8 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (iv)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. Notice Regarding Filing and Service of "Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal" (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendants' Notice regarding Filing and Service of "Norice of Filing of Norice of Removal"-Part 1, #2 Exhibit A to Defendants' Notice regarding Filing and Service of "Norice of Filing of Norice of Removal"-Part 2)(Chow, Teresa)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Decision by JPML filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Approving Stipulation to Suspend Proceedings Pending Decision by JPML)(Chow, Teresa)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Documents No.3 and No.4. The correct event is CERTIFICATE/NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
December 14, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC, Does 1 through 100. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Sean Silver, Aline Baca. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/03/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed as CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Defendant Marriott International Inc.s Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC (Chow, Teresa) Modified on 12/17/2018 (lh).
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed as CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Defendant Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLCs Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC (Chow, Teresa) Modified on 12/17/2018 (lh).
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Chow, Teresa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, case number 18STCV06982 Receipt No: 0973-22901798 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC, Marriott International, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Teresa C Chow added to party Marriott International, Inc., a Delaware Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Teresa C Chow added to party Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC(pty:dft))(Chow, Teresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sean Silver et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., .
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aline Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?