Susan Goldfine Raab v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Goldfine Raab
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc. and Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00522
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 27 MDL Certified Transfer Order Transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Amanda Arnold, Edward Baker, Brad Barringer, Kiana Belcher, Kevin Berry, Susan Beverley, Douglas Blake, Michael Blicher, Carol Blood, Robert Bluestone, Tanesha Boradgiak, Michael Bunker, Brenda Burr, Yvette Butler, Shelia Canipe, Deana Cannon, Catherine Carlberg, Ruthanne Carpenter, Cheryl Castor, Michael Castor, Crystal Chambers, Kathleen Christensen, Prudence Concert-White, Curtis Cummings, Mary Ellen Davey, Christopher Davies, Dorothy Davis, Karen Davis, Kenneth Davis, Graves De Armond, Cynthia Deese, May Desrochers, Scott Dias, Sami Difuntorum, Jonathan Dodart, Julie Duchsherer, Mark Duffey, Gretchen Ehle, Vance Edward Eichelberger, Carla Engle, Barbara Erickson, Michelle Featherstone, Ronald Michael Feschak, Nathan Finney, Janice Frazier-Scott, Lisa Frederickson, Michael Freeland, Lisa Fritz, Marlon Gaines, Steve Gajewski, Laurene Gallway, Eric Gault, Betsy Gentry, Scott Gideon, John Gilliland, Jon Goldberg, Angela Gresh, Latausha Griffin, Jernard Griggs, Edward Hanley, Charles Hanson, Sheila Harrison, Danielle Hayes, Phyllis Hecker, Amber Helton, Jeri Holt-Minter, Virginia Howell, Donna Hughes, Patricia Huizar, Tamika Jackson, Kyle Jaski, Monica Johnson, Nikole Jordan, Mary Jo Jurey, Robert Kaiser, Lucy Karl, Jeffrey Kemp, Linda Kite, Joan Knudson, Sarah Korwan, Ronald Kotz, Ellen Kowitt, Maretta Leitka, Rik Lewis, Beverly Louk, Anthony Malfi, Patrice Matthews, Olivia May, Susan Mcintosh, David Melendez, Holger Meyer, Debra Michaud, Jack Milam, Judy Mills, Chalise Morris, Chris Morris, David Moyer, Susan Mullins, Dorothy Odie, Jeffrey Oelhafen, Christina Olsen, Carol Ostapchuk, Steven Owens, Asim Padh, Justin Palmer, Darrel Parris, Janlisa Parris, Curtis Payne, Lawrence Perlmutter, Jeninne Pitts, Christopher Pratt, Burnease Ragin, Jeffrey Rahn, Michael Raimondi, Karen Rambat, Michael Rapp, Kumar Rashad, Beverly Ricks, Selma Rodriguez, Ruth Patricia Rosados, Andrew Rose, Joel Rosson, Mark Rotondi, Deidrinelle Rouse, Karen Russell, Richard Ryans, Rick Sabath, Bruce Sanders, Anne Santo, Anne Savarese, Vincent Savarese, Sonja Scott, David Secrist, Shawn Seeley, Tonekia Showell, Tamika Simmonds, John Simmons, Edward Siperstein, Lee Slagle, Dale Smith, Shane Somerville, Angela Sonnier, David Sparks, Kent Spence, Jody Stephens, Rhonda Stevens, Theresa Sykes, Debra Talley, Peter Tapling, Joe Taylor, Gordon Thomas, Joseph Throneberry, Beverly Tookey, Ricardo Vaquer, Edgar Vaynshteyn, Vickie Vetter, Felicia Wallace, John Waller, Kevin Walls, Jean Waskiewicz, Curtis Weaver, Ira Weintraub, Janet Wender, Marjorie Wheeler, Doreen Whelan, Debra Whiddon, Melissa White, Charles Williams, Gerald Williams, Linda Winsey, Stacey Wollman, Dennis Wooldridge, Maria Wooten, Ronzella Wright-Loftly, Jason Young, Julie Young, Melissa Yurkanin, Shaun Yurtkuran Plaintiffs' Interim Coordinating Counsel's Proposed CMO Regarding Model Leadship Applications for the Consumer Track Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Pizzirusso, James)
March 19, 2019 Filing 25 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 4 transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Zeldes on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Zeldes, Helen)
March 4, 2019 Filing 23 Correspondence from Clerk to counsel re: transfer of MDL case. (c/e-m 2/27/19 with ECF 3 in PWG 19-md-2879 (Order). (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2019 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-08007. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 21, 2019 Filing 21 TRANSFERRED to the District of Maryland the electronic record. (tt, )
February 21, 2019 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2879 Conditional Transfer Order filed 2/21/19. (tt, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 20 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Maryland.(tt, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing set for 2/28/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice. (etv, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Unopposed motion for entry of stipulated order suspending proceedings pending decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation #12 is granted without an appearance. Initial status hearing set for 2/7/2019 is stricken and re-set to 2/28/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Susan Goldfine Raab. Marriott International, Inc. waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. (Freed, Michael) Modified on 12/21/2018 (tt, ).
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Susan Goldfine Raab. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. (Freed, Michael) Modified on 12/21/2018 (tt, ).
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC (Starwood Notification of Affiliates) (Tzanetopoulos, George)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC (Marriott Notification of Affiliates) (Tzanetopoulos, George)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by George James Tzanetopoulos for presentment of motion for order, #12 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/3/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Tzanetopoulos, George)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC for order suspending proceedings pending decision by judicial panel on multidistrict litigation (Unopposed Motion) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tzanetopoulos, George)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC by George James Tzanetopoulos (Tzanetopoulos, George)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC by Daniel R. Warren (Warren, Daniel)
December 12, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC (ec, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE (tt, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS (Attachments: #1 Letter) (tt, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 2/7/2019 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2141. Mailed notice. (etv, )
December 6, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Marriott International, Inc. (jjr, )
December 6, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Susan Goldfine Raab by Brian M. Hogan (Hogan, Brian)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Susan Goldfine Raab by Douglas A Millen (Millen, Douglas)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Susan Goldfine Raab by Steven A Kanner (Kanner, Steven)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Susan Goldfine Raab by Michael Jerry Freed (Freed, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Freed, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Susan Goldfine Raab; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15246692.(Freed, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Susan Goldfine Raab v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Goldfine Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?