All Weather, Inc. v. Optical Scientific, Inc.
Plaintiff: All Weather, Inc.
Defendant: Optical Scientific, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00565
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Referring Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Optical Scientific, Inc. (Schipper, Susan)
April 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Optical Scientific, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of OSi's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Donald A. Williams in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Schipper, Susan)
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Ruth Schipper on behalf of Optical Scientific, Inc. (Schipper, Susan)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 3/18/2019. (jw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nicholas Martin DePalma. Attorney Nicholas Martin DePalma will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by Optical Scientific, Inc.(Lynn, Ashleigh)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas M. DePalma (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7880144.) by Optical Scientific, Inc.(Lynn, Ashleigh)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh J F Lynn on behalf of Optical Scientific, Inc. (Lynn, Ashleigh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Weather, Inc.. Optical Scientific, Inc. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019.(Caldwell, Adam)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Optical Scientific, Inc. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 2/25/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. All Weather, Inc. or counsel for All Weather, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/11/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by All Weather, Inc. (Caldwell, Adam)
February 22, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7853109.), filed by All Weather, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Caldwell, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All Weather, Inc. v. Optical Scientific, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optical Scientific, Inc.
Represented By: Ashleigh J F Lynn
Represented By: Nicholas Martin DePalma
Represented By: Susan Ruth Schipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Weather, Inc.
Represented By: Adam S Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?