Palmont v. Wright et al

Plaintiff: John H. Palmont, Jr.
Defendant: Maryland Montgomery County, Corporal S. Wright and Montgomery County, Maryland
Case Number: 8:2019cv00568
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 13 Status Conference held on 4/22/2019 before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ats, Chambers)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by John H. Palmont, Jr Plaintiff's Disclosure of Damage Claims (Ray, James)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 telephone conference call on April 22, 2019 at 3:00PM AND DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/9/2019. (ats, Chambers)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Protocols)(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 9/16/2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/9/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Montgomery County, Maryland, Corporal S. Wright.(Mulloy, Heather)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint as follows: Defendants may file a joint response, which shall be due 4/3/19. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/21/2019. (sb2s, Chambers)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Montgomery County, Maryland, Corporal S. Wright(Mulloy, Heather)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John H. Palmont, Jr. Corporal S. Wright served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019.(Ray, James)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John H. Palmont, Jr. Montgomery County, Maryland served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019.(Ray, James)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/25/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Montgomery County, Maryland, Corporal S. Wright.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7853662.), filed by John H. Palmont, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant Wright, #3 Summons Montgomery County)(Ray, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmont v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Montgomery County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal S. Wright
Represented By: Heather Ann Mulloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County, Maryland
Represented By: Heather Ann Mulloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H. Palmont, Jr.
Represented By: James Martin Ray, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?