Ayers v. Vestberg

Plaintiff: Anne L. Ayers
Defendant: Hans Vestberg
Case Number: 8:2019cv00581
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Motion to Inform Plaintiff if her Service was Completed satisfactorily on 4-03-19 & when she can Serve the Subpoena Duces Tecum), by Anne L. Ayers. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/5/2019. (CM 04/08/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hans Vestberg, filed by Anne L. Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Hans Vestberg.(cm 04/03/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2019: #1 Corrected Summons Issued) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 Supplemental (Motion for Extension of Time) filed by Anne L. Ayers to #5 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Hans Vestberg.(cm 03/21/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time, by Anne L. Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT (Signed) against Hans Vestberg, filed by Anne L. Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting the Plaintiff 21 days to file a signed Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/6/2019. (cm as directed 03/06/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/28/2019. (cm 02/28/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hans Vestberg ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637033914.), filed by Anne L. Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayers v. Vestberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans Vestberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne L. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?