Glover v. Tennessee Board of Regents et al

Plaintiff: Alexis Glover
Defendant: Tennesse State University and Tennessee Board of Regents
Case Number: 8:2019cv00583
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 3/18/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Alexis Glover or counsel for Alexis Glover are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 4/1/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to Tennesse State University and Tennessee Board of Regents.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Plaintiff 21 days to complete and return the U.S. Marshal service of process forms; directing the Clerk to issue summons and the U.S. Marshal to effectuate service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 3/11/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m as directed 3/12/19)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexis Glover.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Plaintiff pay the civil filing fee or file an Amended Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 3/4/2019. ( jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexis Glover(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Alexis Glover. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified Complaint for Breach of Contract) against Tennesse State University, Tennessee Board of Regents, filed by Alexis Glover. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Tennessee Board of Regents et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennesse State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Board of Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?