Brantley et al v. Epic Games, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jaylen Brantley and Jared Nickens
Defendant: Does 1-50, Inclusive, John Doe Corporation 1-10 and Epic Games, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00594
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Referring Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER RESCHEDULING PRE-MOTION conference call TO May 2, 2019 at 10:30AM AND DIRECTING defense counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/25/2019. (ats, Chambers)
April 25, 2019 Filing 23 Correspondence re: Request Reschedule Phone Conference (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order)(Jaklitsch, Richard)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING a pre-motion telephone conference call on April 30, 2019 AT 2PM AND DIRECTING defense counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/10/2019. (sb2s, Chambers)
April 9, 2019 Filing 21 Correspondence re: request for permission to file a motion to dismiss Amended Complaint (Docket No. 18) (Ulwick, James)
April 3, 2019 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David Hecht. Directing attorney David Hecht to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/3/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Hecht (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7923658.) by Jaylen Brantley, Jared Nickens(Jaklitsch, Richard)
March 26, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jaylen Brantley, Jared Nickens. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Complaint Redline Edits)(Jaklitsch, Richard)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ulwick, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jaylen Brantley, Jared Nickens. Epic Games, Inc. served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jaklitsch, Richard)
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua Simmons. Directing attorney Joshua Simmons to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/22/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Megan McKeown. Directing attorney Megan McKeown to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/22/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Shanti Sadtler Conway. Directing attorney Shanti Sadtler Conway to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/22/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dale Cendali. Directing attorney Dale Cendali to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/22/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #5 Affidavit of Service filed by Jaylen Brantley and Jared Nickens was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua L. Simmons (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7903393.) by Epic Games, Inc.(Ulwick, James)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Megan L. McKeown (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7903391.) by Epic Games, Inc.(Ulwick, James)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shanti Sadtler Conway (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7903389.) by Epic Games, Inc.(Ulwick, James)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dale M. Cendali (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7903384.) by Epic Games, Inc.(Ulwick, James)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James P Ulwick on behalf of Epic Games, Inc. (Ulwick, James)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Initial Complaint served on EPIC Games, Inc. on 3/4/2019, filed by Jaylen Brantley, Jared Nickens.(Jaklitsch, Richard) Modified on 3/21/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright. (cm 02/28/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/26/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Epic Games, Inc.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Judge Paula Xinis no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7856998.), filed by Jaylen Brantley, Jared Nickens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Def. Epic)(Jaklitsch, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brantley et al v. Epic Games, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaylen Brantley
Represented By: Richard L Jaklitsch
Represented By: David Hecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Nickens
Represented By: Richard L Jaklitsch
Represented By: David Hecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Levicoff Simmons
Represented By: Shanti Sadtler Conway
Represented By: Dale Margaret Cendali
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Megan L McKeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?