Proctor et al v. McMillian et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Proctor, Emily Stoffel and Cheryl Mason
Defendant: Falecia McMillian, Prince George's County Public Schools and Debra Evans
Case Number: 8:2019cv00602
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/18/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cheryl Mason, Lisa Proctor, Emily Stoffel (Tucker, Charles)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Debra Evans, Falecia McMillian, Prince George's County Public Schools (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(McCollum, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Prince George's County Public Schools identifying Other Affiliate Prince George's County Risk Management Fund for Prince George's County Public Schools.(McCollum, James)
February 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Paula Xinis. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL18-48233. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7857841), filed by Falecia McMillian, Prince George's County Public Schools, Debra Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(McCollum, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proctor et al v. McMillian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falecia McMillian
Represented By: James E McCollum, Jr
Represented By: Amit Kumar Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince George's County Public Schools
Represented By: James E McCollum, Jr
Represented By: Amit Kumar Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Evans
Represented By: James E McCollum, Jr
Represented By: Amit Kumar Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Proctor
Represented By: Charles Tucker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Stoffel
Represented By: Charles Tucker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Mason
Represented By: Charles Tucker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?