Washington v. Wallop

Plaintiff: Michelle Washington
Defendant: Teonna Wallop
Case Number: 8:2019cv00615
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1127
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Michelle Washington. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Teonna Wallop. (c/m 3/25/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Clerk to issue summons and return to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/25/2019. (c/m 3/25/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER VACATING #2 Order dated March 15, 2019 dismissing the Complaint without prejudice and closing this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to REOPEN this case. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/22/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 3/22/19)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 [VACATED - SEE 4] ORDER Dismissing #1 Complaint without prejudice; Directing Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/15/2019. (c/m 3/18/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/22/2019 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
March 6, 2019 Deficiency Notice as to Michelle Washington -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . The form must be filed by 3/13/2019 (Form mailed 3/6/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teonna Wallop (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637113174), filed by Michelle Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Wallop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teonna Wallop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?