City Of Chicago v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Chicago
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC and Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00654
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 57 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by City of ChicagoAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Richman, Benjamin)
August 21, 2020 Filing 56 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edmund Alves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Verification, #5 Verification)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(O Connell, Andrew) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS ORDER finding as moot #53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/16/2020. (el2s, Chambers)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order -SEALED- PAPERLESS ORDER granting #41 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/16/2020. (el2s, Chambers)
March 30, 2020 Filing 55 STATUS REPORT /Joint Status Report by Construction Laborers Pension Trust for Southern CaliforniaAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Villegas, Carol)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Canceling Status Conference. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/16/2020. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 53 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Johnsgard, Amy) Modified on 3/2/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER in Consumer Actions granting in part and denying in part (450) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (451) Motion to Dismiss in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2020 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2020 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION in Consumer Actions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2020 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2020 Filing 50 ANSWER to (27 in 8:19-cv-00654-PWG, 294 in 8:19-md-02879-PWG) Amended Complaint, (296 in 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 29 in 8:19-cv-00654-PWG) Amended Complaint by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Warren, Daniel) Modified on 1/28/2020 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
January 8, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Iman Boundaoui on behalf of City of Chicago Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Boundaoui, Iman)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PAPERLESS ORDER memorializing the conference call held on January 6, 2020. Counsel will proceed in accordance with the discovery deadlines outlined in Case Management Order 4 [ECF No. 370 in PWG-19-2879]. Counsel will coordinate with Special Master Judge Facciola should any dispute arise. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/6/2020. (Grimm, Paul)
December 20, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulated Motion for 30-Day Extension to Answer City of Chicago's Amended Complaint by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Ghannoum, Lisa)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG in case 8:19-cv-00654-PWG; denying (331) Motion to Dismiss in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG; denying (32) Motion to Dismiss in case 8:19-cv-00654-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/13/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(ybs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/13/2019 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
September 11, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE by Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION AND ADDRESS Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Travis, Ben)
September 4, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re (331 in 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 32 in 8:19-cv-00654-PWG) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the City of Chicago's Amended Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Warren, Daniel)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting (383) Motion for Leave to File Portions of its Response Memorandum Under Seal 8:19-md-02879-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/16/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re (331 in 8:19-md-02879-PWG) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the City of Chicago's Amended Complaint (Redacted) by City of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Richman, Benjamin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Seal Portions of Its Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by City of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Richman, Benjamin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 40 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re (331 in 8:19-md-02879-PWG) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the City of Chicago's Amended Complaint by City of Chicago. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Richman, Benjamin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 39 Correspondence re: Bellwether Selection Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Pizzirusso, James)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to File Portions of Their Motion under seal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/17/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Sydney M Janzen on behalf of City of Chicago Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Janzen, Sydney)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DISCOVERY ORDER Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/16/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/16/2019Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Seal by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Warren, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 33 -SEALED-Memorandum re (331 in 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 32 in 8:19-cv-00654-PWG) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the City of Chicago's Amended Complaint filed by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Part 1], #2 Exhibit A [Part 2])Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Warren, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the City of Chicago's Amended Complaint by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Warren, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 295 Motion to Seal Portions of First Amended Complaint in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/21/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 30 -SEALED- AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, filed by City of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint identifying amendments)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Richman, Benjamin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 29 -SEALED- AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, filed by City of Chicago.Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Richman, Benjamin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Seal Portions of First Amended Complaint by City of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Richman, Benjamin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, filed by City of Chicago.Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Richman, Benjamin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file joint ESI Protocol by Gretchen Ehle (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Friedman, Andrew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION for Alternative Service by Yisroel MannAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Schlachet, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Donna Hiteshew of Withdrawal of Eve Lynn J. Rapp from Consumer Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Rapp, Eve-Lynn)
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Address by Katrina Carroll Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Carroll, Katrina)
June 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin H Richman on behalf of City of Chicago Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Richman, Benjamin)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER and FRE(D) and (E) CLAWBACK ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/5/2019 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 Appointing Lead Counsel, Liaison Counsel and Steering Committee. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/29/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 11, 2019 Filing 19 MDL Certified Transfer Order Transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Amanda Arnold, Edward Baker, Brad Barringer, Kiana Belcher, Kevin Berry, Susan Beverley, Douglas Blake, Michael Blicher, Carol Blood, Robert Bluestone, Tanesha Boradgiak, Michael Bunker, Brenda Burr, Yvette Butler, Shelia Canipe, Deana Cannon, Catherine Carlberg, Ruthanne Carpenter, Cheryl Castor, Michael Castor, Crystal Chambers, Kathleen Christensen, Prudence Concert-White, Curtis Cummings, Mary Ellen Davey, Christopher Davies, Dorothy Davis, Karen Davis, Kenneth Davis, Graves De Armond, Cynthia Deese, May Desrochers, Scott Dias, Sami Difuntorum, Jonathan Dodart, Julie Duchsherer, Mark Duffey, Gretchen Ehle, Vance Edward Eichelberger, Carla Engle, Barbara Erickson, Michelle Featherstone, Ronald Michael Feschak, Nathan Finney, Janice Frazier-Scott, Lisa Frederickson, Michael Freeland, Lisa Fritz, Marlon Gaines, Steve Gajewski, Laurene Gallway, Eric Gault, Betsy Gentry, Scott Gideon, John Gilliland, Jon Goldberg, Angela Gresh, Latausha Griffin, Jernard Griggs, Edward Hanley, Charles Hanson, Sheila Harrison, Danielle Hayes, Phyllis Hecker, Amber Helton, Jeri Holt-Minter, Virginia Howell, Donna Hughes, Patricia Huizar, Tamika Jackson, Kyle Jaski, Monica Johnson, Nikole Jordan, Mary Jo Jurey, Robert Kaiser, Lucy Karl, Jeffrey Kemp, Linda Kite, Joan Knudson, Sarah Korwan, Ronald Kotz, Ellen Kowitt, Maretta Leitka, Rik Lewis, Beverly Louk, Anthony Malfi, Patrice Matthews, Olivia May, Susan Mcintosh, David Melendez, Holger Meyer, Debra Michaud, Jack Milam, Judy Mills, Chalise Morris, Chris Morris, David Moyer, Susan Mullins, Dorothy Odie, Jeffrey Oelhafen, Christina Olsen, Carol Ostapchuk, Steven Owens, Asim Padh, Justin Palmer, Darrel Parris, Janlisa Parris, Curtis Payne, Lawrence Perlmutter, Jeninne Pitts, Christopher Pratt, Burnease Ragin, Jeffrey Rahn, Michael Raimondi, Karen Rambat, Michael Rapp, Kumar Rashad, Beverly Ricks, Selma Rodriguez, Ruth Patricia Rosados, Andrew Rose, Joel Rosson, Mark Rotondi, Deidrinelle Rouse, Karen Russell, Richard Ryans, Rick Sabath, Bruce Sanders, Anne Santo, Anne Savarese, Vincent Savarese, Sonja Scott, David Secrist, Shawn Seeley, Tonekia Showell, Tamika Simmonds, John Simmons, Edward Siperstein, Lee Slagle, Dale Smith, Shane Somerville, Angela Sonnier, David Sparks, Kent Spence, Jody Stephens, Rhonda Stevens, Theresa Sykes, Debra Talley, Peter Tapling, Joe Taylor, Gordon Thomas, Joseph Throneberry, Beverly Tookey, Ricardo Vaquer, Edgar Vaynshteyn, Vickie Vetter, Felicia Wallace, John Waller, Kevin Walls, Jean Waskiewicz, Curtis Weaver, Ira Weintraub, Janet Wender, Marjorie Wheeler, Doreen Whelan, Debra Whiddon, Melissa White, Charles Williams, Gerald Williams, Linda Winsey, Stacey Wollman, Dennis Wooldridge, Maria Wooten, Ronzella Wright-Loftly, Jason Young, Julie Young, Melissa Yurkanin, Shaun Yurtkuran Plaintiffs' Interim Coordinating Counsel's Proposed CMO Regarding Model Leadship Applications for the Consumer Track Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Pizzirusso, James)
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J Kane on behalf of City of Chicago Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-00654-PWG(Kane, Stephen)
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 4 transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Zeldes on behalf of Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Zeldes, Helen)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 Correspondence from Clerk to counsel re: transfer of MDL case. (c/e-m 2/27/19 with ECF 3 in PWG 19-md-2879 (Order) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00948. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 3/4/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSFERRED to the District of Maryland the electronic record. (kp, )
March 1, 2019 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2879 Conditional Transfer Order filed 3/1/2019. (kp, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Maryland. (kp, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Chicago by Jane E. Notz (Notz, Jane)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Chicago. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC waiver sent on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Kane, Stephen)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Chicago. Marriott International, Inc. waiver sent on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Kane, Stephen)
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC (Starwood) (Tzanetopoulos, George)
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC (Marriott) (Tzanetopoulos, George)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC by George James Tzanetopoulos (Tzanetopoulos, George)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC by Daniel R. Warren (Warren, Daniel)
February 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City Of Chicago by Stephen J Kane (Kane, Stephen)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kane, Stephen)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by City Of Chicago; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15488119.(Kane, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City Of Chicago v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Chicago
Represented By: Stephen J Kane
Represented By: Benjamin H Richman
Represented By: Sydney M Janzen
Represented By: Iman Boundaoui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?