Aarow Contracting, Inc. v. Fidelity Deposit Company of Maryland

Plaintiff: United States ex rel Aarow Contracting, Inc. and Aarow Contracting, Inc.
Defendant: Fidelity Deposit Company of Maryland
Case Number: 8:2019cv00692
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 16 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Stover, Michael)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #14 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/25/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/25/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery now closes November 8, 2019.. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/24/2019. (nrs, Chambers)
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 Case Management Conference held on 4/24/2019 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-2B.) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time /Modify Scheduling Order by Aarow Contracting, Inc.(Hibshman, Douglas)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/10/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE/ORDER scheduling a Case Management Conference for April 24, 2019 at 4:00 PM. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/10/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Fidelity Deposit Company of Maryland identifying Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, a Swiss Corporation for Fidelity Deposit Company of Maryland.(Stover, Michael)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Fidelity Deposit Company of Maryland identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, a Swiss Corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company for Fidelity Deposit Company of Maryland.(Stover, Michael)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Fidelity Deposit Company of Maryland.(Stover, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Fidelity Deposit Company of Maryland.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Aarow Contracting, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Proposed Summons (Hibshman, Douglas)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/7/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Aarow Contracting, Inc. was filed with the following attachment missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. **The Disclosure of Corporate Interest must be filed separately using the event Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fidelity Deposit Company of Maryland ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7874847.), filed by United States ex rel Aarow Contracting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Disclosure of Corporate Interests)(Hibshman, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aarow Contracting, Inc. v. Fidelity Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States ex rel Aarow Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas P Hibshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aarow Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas P Hibshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Michael Alden Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?