Ayana Andrews, Parent & Next Friend of S.H., a minor v. Board of Education of Prince Georges County et al

Plaintiff: AYANA ANDREWS, Parent & Next Friend of S.H., a minor and Ayana Andrews
Defendant: Board of Education of Prince Georges County, Deonte Lavell Carraway and City of Glenarden, Maryland
Case Number: 8:2019cv00706
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #29 Consent Motion to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/2/2019. (rass, Chambers)
May 1, 2019 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages CONSENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION REGARDING REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Board of Education of Prince Georges County(Scott, Andrew)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #27 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Reply. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/22/2019. (rass, Chambers)
April 22, 2019 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Board of Education of Prince Georges County(Williams, Kambon)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #23 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Thirty-Five Page Limit and File Forty-Seven Page Opposition. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/17/2019. (rass, Chambers)
April 16, 2019 Filing 25 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Ayana Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 33)(Lucas, Frederic W)
April 16, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition, Memorandum in Support of Opposition and attached exhibits by Ayana Andrews(Lucas, Frederic W)
April 16, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File to Exceed the 35 page limit and file 47 Page Opposition by Ayana Andrews(Lucas, Frederic W)
April 11, 2019 Filing 22 [FILED IN ERROR - COUNSEL NOTIFIED THE COURT THE DOCUMENTS SHOULD NOT BE SEALED] QC NOTICE: #20 -SEALED- Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Ayana Andrews was filed incorrectly. **A Motion to Seal is required to be filed with any document filed under seal. Please file a Motion to Seal (kns, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/11/2019 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/9/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/11/2019 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
April 7, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment by Ayana Andrews(Lucas, Frederic W) Modified on 4/11/2019 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
April 3, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.5 (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Summary, #2 1.9.18 - Certificate of Discovery - Plaintiff Rogs to Defendant, #3 1.11.18 - Hearing Notice, #4 2.22.18 - NOS NTD Ped Wellness, #5 2.22.18 - NOS NTD PG Comm Peds and PG Hospital, #6 3.17.17 - Memo of Court - Stay in place, #7 3.17.17 - Notice of Hearing, #8 4.3.17 - Memo and Order of Court -ORDERED, the Court takes No Action as to Letter from Carraway, #9 4.3.18 - Certificate regarding Discovery, #10 4.9.17 - NOS Glenarden RFP, #11 4.9.17 - NOS Glenarden Rogs, #12 4.11.17 - change address and firm affiliation for F. Scott Lucas, Esq, #13 4.13.17 - Amended Consent Order, #14 4.13.18 - Civil Daily Sheet dated 1.10.18, #15 4.13.18 - Civil Daily Sheet dated 10.4.17, #16 4.13.18 Consent Order, #17 8.10.16 - Civil Case Information Report, #18 8.10.16 - Complaint, #19 8.10.16 - Summons Issued, #20 8.16.17 - Notice of Hearing, #21 8.22.18 - Stipulation regarding the production, use or effect of certain unproduced therapist records for the minor plaintiff, #22 8.24.17 - Civil Daily Sheet dated 8.11.07, #23 8.31.16 - Entry of Appearance - O'meally and Scott, #24 9.5.17 - Notice of Appearance - Karpinski, #25 9.8.17 - Notice to Karpinski - Appearance fees, #26 9.12.18 - Memo of Court - 10 minute phone conference, #27 9.12.18-2 - Memo of Court - Add dispositive motion date, #28 9.16.16 - Affidavit of Service - Writs to BOE, #29 9.21.16 - Memo of Court - cases are Consolidated, #30 9.21.16 -Notice of Hearing, #31 9.26.16 - Affidavit of service - Writ to Carraway, #32 10.6.17 - BOE Partial Answer, #33 10.6.17 - Memo in support of partial motion to dismiss;, #34 10.6.17 - Notice of Hearing, #35 10.6.17 - Partial Motion to Dismiss, #36 10.11.17 - Entry of Appearance KRW, #37 10.13.17 - NOS BOE RFP to Plaintiff, #38 10.13.17 - NOS BOE Rogs to Plaintiff, #39 10.20.17 - First Amended Complaint, #40 10.26.17 - Board of Education of Prince George's County's Answer to Amended Complaint, #41 11.2.17 - Order of Court - Case Specially Assigned for all purposes to Judge Green, #42 11.8.17 - Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #43 11.8.17 - Motion to Dismiss, #44 Certification of True Copies, #45 Consolidated Case Civil Case Summary, #46 4.13.18 - Order of Court dated March 13, 2018, #47 4.13.18 - Order regarding confidentiality of Discovery Material dated January 10, 2018, #48 4.13.18 - Order regarding confidentiality of Discovery Material dated January 29, 2018, #49 5.24.18 - Order of Court dated May 18, 2018, #50 9.17.18 - Motion of sanctions against by defendant Deonte Carraway, #51 9.21.16 - Order of Court- that this case is stayed, #52 10.1.18 - Partial opposition to board of educations motion for sanctions, #53 10.2.18 - JGL Plantiffs opposition to defendant Board of Educations motion for sanctions, #54 10.11.18 - Motion for hearing on the Board of Educations motion for sanctions, #55 10.11.18 - Reply to JGL Plantiffs opposition to Board Of Educations motion for sanctions, #56 10.12.18 - Reply to defendant Zion Praise tabernacle Lutheran Church's partial opposition, #57 10.16.18 - Board Of Educations motion to strike defendant Carraway's affidavits, #58 10.16.18 - Board of Educations motion to strike zions motion for hearing as an improper sur-reply, #59 10.23.18 -Opposition to board of education motion to stike Zions motion for hearing, #60 10.26.18 - GL Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Carraway's Affidavit, #61 10.29.18 - Board Of Educations motion to strike defendant Carraway's affidavits, #62 11.1.18 - Line Supplementing exhibits 6 of the board educations motion to strike defendant, #63 11.13.18 - Opposition to Board of Educations and JGL Plaintiffs motion to strike, #64 11.19.18 - Reply to defendant Zion Praise Tabernacle Lutheran Churchs opposition to board of educations motion to strike, #65 Consolidated case Certification of True Copies)(Williams, Kambon)
March 27, 2019 Filing 18 Supplemental to #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Board of Education of Prince Georges County TABLE OF CONTENTS (Scott, Andrew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Board of Education of Prince Georges County re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Line Confirming Service of Papers Filed Under Seal Upon Opposing Counsel (Scott, Andrew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Seal MOTION TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ALL RELATED EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL by Board of Education of Prince Georges County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Scott, Andrew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 15 -SEALED- MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Board of Education of Prince Georges County (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(Scott, Andrew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 -SEALED- MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Board of Education of Prince Georges County(Scott, Andrew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED by Board of Education of Prince Georges County.(Scott, Andrew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FROM STATE COURT against Board of Education of Prince Georges County, and Deonte Lavell Carraway, filed by Ayana Andrews. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FROM STATE COURT against Board of Education of Prince Georges County and Deonte Lavell Carraway, filed by Ayana Andrews. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT FROM STATE COURT against Board of Education of Prince Georges County and Deonte Lavell Carraway, filed by Ayana Andrews. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ayana Andrews (Lucas, Frederic W)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Board of Education of Prince Georges County STATEMENT OF FILING AND SERVICE OF NOTIFICATION OF REMOVAL (Williams, Kambon)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Board of Education of Prince Georges County identifying Other Affiliate Prince George's County Risk Management Fund for Board of Education of Prince Georges County.(Williams, Kambon)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Board of Education of Prince Georges County.(Williams, Kambon)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/7/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Board of Education of Prince Georges County re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, Line correcting Removed State Court case number (Williams, Kambon)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT CAPTION) NOTICE by Board of Education of Prince Georges County Notice that a copy of the Notice of Removal was filed with the Clerk of the Circuit Court for Prince Georges County and counsel of record (Williams, Kambon) Modified on 3/8/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT CAPTION) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Board of Education of Prince Georges County identifying Other Affiliate Prince George's County Risk Management Fund for Board of Education of Prince Georges County.(Williams, Kambon) Modified on 3/8/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL16-30864. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7877241), filed by Board of Education of Prince Georges County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Summons, #3 State Court Case Information Sheet, #4 State Court Complaint, #5 First Amended Complaint, #6 Second Amended Complaint, #7 BOE Partial Answer, #8 BOE Partial Motion to Dismiss, #9 BOE Answer to Amended Complaint, #10 Order regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material, #11 Consent Order of Joint Motion for Preserv. of Evid. & Insp. of Contraband, #12 Amended Consent Order of Joint Motion for Preserv. of Evid. & Insp. of Contraban..., #13 Stipulation Regarding the Production, Use, or Effect of Certain Unproduced Records, #14 Memorandum and Order of Court re Contempt, #15 Memorandum and Order of Court re letter from Carraway, #16 Memorandum of Court re telephone conference with Carraway, #17 Memorandum of Court regarding assignment to Judge Green, #18 Memorandum Order to Consolidate, #19 Memorandum re Stay of Matter, #20 Motion to Dismiss w Memorandum by The City of Glenarden)(Williams, Kambon) Modified on 3/7/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayana Andrews, Parent & Next Friend of S.H., a minor v. Board of Education of Prince Georges County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AYANA ANDREWS, Parent & Next Friend of S.H., a minor
Represented By: Frederic W Scott Lucas
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Johnine Nicollette Clark
Represented By: David Michael Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayana Andrews
Represented By: Frederic W Scott Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Prince Georges County
Represented By: Andrew G Scott
Represented By: Edmund J O Meally
Represented By: Kambon Raymond Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deonte Lavell Carraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Glenarden, Maryland
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?