Local 689, Amalgamated Transit Union v. Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Plaintiff: Local 689, Amalgamated Transit Union
Defendant: WMATA and Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Case Number: 8:2019cv00733
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 9:4
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Local 689, Amalgamated Transit Union.(Tyler, Paul)
April 3, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Tabitha Davisson. Directing attorney Tabitha Davisson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/3/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Charles Poplstein. Directing attorney Charles Poplstein to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/3/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert O. Potts, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Anthony A. Anderson)(Miller, Jan)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Petition to Compel Arbitration by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority.(Miller, Jan)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (Miller, Jan)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tabitha G. Davisson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7926244.) by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority(Miller, Jan)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles M. Poplstein (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7926233.) by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority(Miller, Jan)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion Regarding Filing Deadline. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 3/21/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION re #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Regarding Filing Deadline by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Jan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Local 689, Amalgamated Transit Union (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment, #9 Attachment, #10 Attachment, #11 Attachment)(Tyler, Paul)
March 8, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Local 689, Amalgamated Transit Union (Tyler, Paul)
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WMATA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7881383.), filed by Local 689, Amalgamated Transit Union. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Tyler, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local 689, Amalgamated Transit Union v. Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMATA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Represented By: Charles Poplstein, Sr.
Represented By: Jan Paul Miller
Represented By: Tabitha G Davisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 689, Amalgamated Transit Union
Represented By: Paul Mackenzie Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?