Unaegbu v. Midland Credit Management Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Chinaedu Unaegbu
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC and Midland Credit Management Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00828
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SETTLEMENT ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/13/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Chinaedu Unaegbu (Lippman, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 PAPERLESS NOTICE REQUESTING STATUS REPORT and advising counsel/parties of record that, in reviewing the docket in this case, it appears that no activity has taken place since April 9, 2019. Counsel/parties of record should submit a Status Report in writing via electronic case filing as to the current status of this case by no later than close of business on Friday, June 14, 2019. (rass, Chambers)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chinaedu Unaegbu. Midland Credit Management Inc. served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019.(Lippman, Jeffrey)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chinaedu Unaegbu. Midland Funding, LLC served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019.(Lippman, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Midland Credit Management Inc., Midland Funding, LLC.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management Inc., Midland Funding, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7898096.), filed by Chinaedu Unaegbu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit April 2018 Letter - 7512 Debt, #2 Exhibit April 2018 Letter - 4913 Debt, #3 Exhibit October 24 2018 Letter - 7512 Debt, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Midland Credit Management, Inc., #6 Summons Midland Funding, LLC)(Lippman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unaegbu v. Midland Credit Management Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chinaedu Unaegbu
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Lippman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?