Iverson v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Frederick D. Iverson
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00851
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC re #11 Reply to Response to Motion (Corrected) (Thomas, Lindsey)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Thomas, Lindsey)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Frederick D. Iverson.(Weatherspoon, Gladys)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Thomas, Lindsey)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thomas, Lindsey)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence re: Removal Notification Letter.(c/m & em 3/21/19 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Jaguar Land Rover Limited, Other Affiliate Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC, Other Affiliate TML Holdings Pte Ltd., Other Affiliate Tata Motors Ltd. for Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.5 Certification of Filing of State Court Papers. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC filed by Frederick D. Iverson. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL18-45966. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637113794) filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iverson v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick D. Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Represented By: Lindsey Ann Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?