Erie Insurance Exchange et al v. Water Safety Corporation
Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Exchange, Rachel Ricther, Samuel Diener and Robert Richter
Defendant: Water Safety Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01076
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 6/19/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #26 modification of the Scheduling Order. The Court adopts the proposed schedule set forth therein, and will refer this matter for an early settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 6/19/2019. (Day, Charles)
June 18, 2019 Filing 26 Correspondence re: Request for Early Settlement Conference and Amendment of Deadlines (North, Jeremy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Water Safety Corporation.(Ward, Margaret)
June 6, 2019 Filing 24 QC NOTICE: #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Erie Insurance Exchange needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alexandra Torriero (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8053890.) by Erie Insurance Exchange(North, Jeremy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Erie Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Redline version of Amended Complaint)(North, Jeremy)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 5/23/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 5/15/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #9 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 5/15/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 15 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Please correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 QC NOTICE: #13 Amended Complaint filed by Erie Insurance Exchange needs to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please re-file the clean version of the amended complaint as the main document and the redline version as an attachment to the amended complaint. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Water Safety Corporation, filed by Erie Insurance Exchange.(North, Jeremy) Modified on 5/10/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Water Safety Corporation or counsel for Water Safety Corporation are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/21/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Water Safety Corporation (Ward, Margaret)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Water Safety Corporation.(Ward, Margaret)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Erie Insurance Exchange to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/31/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Erie Insurance Exchange files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 4/29/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erie Insurance Exchange. Water Safety Corporation served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019.(North, Jeremy)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #6 Affidavit of Service filed by Erie Insurance Exchange was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process - Summons Returned Executed. The documents have been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document links has been disabled. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Erie Insurance Exchange(North, Jeremy) Modified on 4/26/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Erie Insurance Exchange identifying Other Affiliate Erie Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Erie Family Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Erie Insurance Company of New York, Other Affiliate Flagship City Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Erie Insurance Company for Erie Insurance Exchange.(North, Jeremy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Water Safety Corporation. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 4/12/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Erie Insurance Exchange or counsel for Erie Insurance Exchange are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 4/26/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 12, 2019 Deficiency Notice as to Erie Insurance Exchange -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 4/19/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Erie Insurance Exchange (Filing fee $400.00 Receipt No. 0416-7943395). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(North, Jeremy) Modified on 4/10/2019 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
April 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. (ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erie Insurance Exchange et al v. Water Safety Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Jeremy W North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Ricther
Represented By: Jeremy W North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Diener
Represented By: Jeremy W North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Richter
Represented By: Jeremy W North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Water Safety Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?