Boyd v. Marriott International Inc et al

Plaintiff: William Boyd
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc. and Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01091
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00205. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) transferring this case as part of MDL No. 2879 to the U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 4/11/2019. (jak)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants. Daniel R. Warren is hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/10/2019. (ljb)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by William Boyd. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC served on 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bates, Joseph)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by William Boyd. Marriott International Inc served on 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bates, Joseph)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC (Ezzie, Joseph)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Marriott International Inc (Ezzie, Joseph)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Daniel R. Warren. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3436777. Filed by Marriott International Inc, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC (Ezzie, Joseph)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Ezzie on behalf of Marriott International Inc, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC (Ezzie, Joseph)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the direction of the Court on 3/27/2019. (cmn)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by William Boyd against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT071419. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Marriott International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?