Consolidated Waterproofing Contractors, Inc. v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.

Plaintiff: Consolidated Waterproofing Contractors, Inc.
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01258
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/25/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Consolidated Waterproofing Contractors, Inc. (Woll, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Stephen Woll on behalf of Consolidated Waterproofing Contractors, Inc. (Woll, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc..(Geiser, James)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Answer or otherwise response to the Complaint is due May 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 5/8/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 4) by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Geiser, James)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal Statement Concerning Removal (Geiser, James)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal #1 Notice of Removal filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/30/2019 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Paula Xinis. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4, 5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc..(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc., filed by Consolidated Waterproofing Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Holdings (Ireland) Ltd., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company, Ltd., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings (Switzerland) GMbH, Corporate Parent OCM Goldfish Inc., Corporate Parent OMERS Administration Corporation, Corporate Parent 1102952 B.C. Unlimited Liability Company, Other Affiliate Allied World Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Holdings (U.S.) Inc., Other Affiliate Allied World National Assurance Company, Other Affiliate Allied World Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Company (Europe) dac, Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Company, AG, Other Affiliate Allied World Capital (Europe) Limited, Other Affiliate Allied World Europe Holdings, Ltd., Other Affiliate Allied World Financial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Allied World Financial Services, Ltd., Other Affiliate Allied World Investment Company, Other Affiliate Allied World Reinsurance Management Company, Other Affiliate Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allied World Syndicate Services (Bermuda), Ltd, Other Affiliate Allied World Syndicate Services (Singapore) Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate Arya Claims Services, LLC, Other Affiliate AW Underwriters Inc., Other Affiliate AWAC Services Company, Other Affiliate AWAC Services Company (Bermuda), Ltd, Other Affiliate AWAC Services Company (Ireland) Limited, Other Affiliate Gravity Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate Vantapro Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Vault Custom Risk Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate Vault E&S Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Vault Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Vault Risk Management Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Allied World Managing Agency Limited for Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Geiser, James)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet (Geiser, James)
April 29, 2019 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0416-7981616(Geiser, James)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL18-38785., filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Geiser, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consolidated Waterproofing Contractors, Inc. v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.
Represented By: James Henry Geiser, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Waterproofing Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Scott Dunbar
Represented By: Michael Stephen Woll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?