Doe # 13 v. Prince George's County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe # 13, Individually and as Parent and Next Friend of John Doe #10, a minor and Jane Doe #13
Defendant: Michelle Williams, Prince George's County Board of Education and Deonte Lavell Carraway
Case Number: 8:2019cv01314
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 Corrected MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jane Doe #13.(Bryant, Matthew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Seal MOTION TO FILE REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER SEAL by Prince George's County Board of Education (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Scott, Andrew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 28 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss BOARD OF EDUCATION'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT w/MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT Defendant Board of Education of Prince George's County's Reply to Opposition to Partial Motion to Dismiss and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Prince George's County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Scott, Andrew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation re Board's Reply to Opposition to Partial Motion to Dismiss and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment by Prince George's County Board of Education(Scott, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 Corrected MOTION to Remand to State Court BOARD OF EDUCATION OF PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' CORRECTED MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT filed by Prince George's County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Scott, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM/ORDER requesting parties to file any relevant motions or notices regarding remanding this case to state court be filed within 14 days and allowing 10 days to respond to such filings. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/10/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jane Doe #13 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prawde, Alyse)
May 31, 2019 Filing 23 Interim MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Board of Education's Partial Motion to Dismiss and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment by Jane Doe #13 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prawde, Alyse)
May 31, 2019 Filing 22 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss BOARD OF EDUCATION'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT w/MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by Jane Doe #13. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit)(Prawde, Alyse)
May 31, 2019 Filing 21 Corrected MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jane Doe #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryant, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 7 and 8 to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court by Jane Doe #13 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryant, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit 8 to Pl Motion to Remand by Jane Doe #13 re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Bryant, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit 7 to Pl Motion to Remand by Jane Doe #13 re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Bryant, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jane Doe #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit (actual exhibit to be filed under seal), #8 Exhibit (actual exhibit to be filed under seal), #9 Exhibit, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryant, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #14 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time by Seven Days for Filing Opposition to Defendant Prince George's County Board of Education's Partial Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment (until May 31, 2019). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/24/2019. (rass, Chambers)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss BOARD OF EDUCATION'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT w/MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time By Seven Days for Filing Oppositon to Defendant Board of Education of Prince George's County's Partial Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Prince George's County Board of Education.(Williams, Kambon)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss BOARD OF EDUCATION'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT w/MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Jane Doe #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Prawde, Alyse)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Michelle Williams (Foley, Mark)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Seal BOARD OF EDUCATION'S MOTION TO FILE PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ALL RELATED EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL by Prince George's County Board of Education (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material)(Scott, Andrew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 -SEALED- MOTION to Dismiss BOARD OF EDUCATION'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT w/MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Prince George's County Board of Education (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit 1 Consolidation Order, #4 Exhibit 2 Orders Relating to Stay, #5 Exhibit 3 Transcript of Michelle Williams, #6 Exhibit 4 Dedicated Aide Job Descripton, #7 Exhibit 5 Carraway's High School Diploma, #8 Exhibit 6 Criminal Background Check Documents, #9 Exhibit 7 Transcript of Angela Bowen, #10 Exhibit 8 Transcript of Jaim Gann, #11 Exhibit 9 Board 0106, #12 Exhibit 10 Administrative Procedure 4216.6, #13 Exhibit 11 June 15, 2015 Email, #14 Exhibit 12 Transcript of Tamia Price, #15 Exhibit 13 CPS Form, #16 Exhibit 14 February 4, 2014 No Trespass Letter, #17 Exhibit 15 February 4, 2016 Email)(Scott, Andrew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages DEFENDANT BOARD OF EDUCATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION REGARDING MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Prince George's County Board of Education(Scott, Andrew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Complaint BOARD OF EDUCATION OF PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY'S PARTIAL ANSWER TO COMPLAINT by Prince George's County Board of Education.(Scott, Andrew)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #5 Complaint , ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Michelle Williams.(Foley, Mark)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Prince George's County Board of Education.(Williams, Kambon)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/6/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Deonte Lavell Carraway, Prince George's County Board of Education and Michelle Williams, filed by Jane Doe #13.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Prince George's County Board of Education Statement of Filing and Service of Notification of Removal (Williams, Kambon)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Prince George's County Board of Education CERTIFICATION OF FILING OF STATE COURT PAPERS (Williams, Kambon)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Prince George's County Board of Education identifying Other Affiliate Prince Georges County Risk Management Fund for Prince George's County Board of Education.(Williams, Kambon)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County Maryland, case number CAL19-03979. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7991254), filed by Prince George's County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Summons, #5 State Court Civil Information Report, #6 State Court Civil Case Summary, #7 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #8 Affidavit of State Court service to Carraway, #9 Line - Issue State Court Summons, #10 Maoloney Bryant Prawde Entry of Appearance, #11 Simpson Entry of Appearance, #12 State Court True Copy Certification)(Williams, Kambon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe # 13 v. Prince George's County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Williams
Represented By: Mark T Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince George's County Board of Education
Represented By: Andrew G Scott
Represented By: Edmund J O Meally
Represented By: Kambon Raymond Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deonte Lavell Carraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe # 13, Individually and as Parent and Next Friend of John Doe #10, a minor
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Represented By: David Michael Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe #13
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Represented By: David Michael Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?