Caldwell v. U.S. Department of Education
Plaintiff: David Lee Caldwell
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Case Number: 8:2019cv01366
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Department of Education served on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Supplemental Attachments to #9 Request (Motion) to Stop Payment filed by David Lee Caldwell (Attachments: #1 Attachment Part 2, #2 Attachment Part 3, #3 Attachment Part 4) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Request (Motion) to Stop Payment by David Caldwell (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Correspondence from David Caldwell re: Claims (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued 60 days as to U.S. Department of Education, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Supplemental to #4 Amended Complaint filed by David Lee Caldwell (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2019: #2 Attachment) (km4s, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2019: #3 Receipt (Certificate of Service)) (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Clerk to mail Plaintiff 3 US Marshal service of process forms and 3 summons; Granting Plaintiff 21 days to return the Marshal forms and summons; Directing Clerk to issue summons upon receipt; Directing US Marshals to effectuate service of process. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 5/29/2019. (c/m 5/29/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Education, filed by David Lee Caldwell. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2019: #2 Attachment) (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting Caldwell 28 days to file an Amended Complaint; Forewarning Caldwell that failure to comply with this Order in the time specified will result in dismissal of the Complaint without prejudice and without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 5/15/2019. (c/m 5/16/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Lee Caldwell (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Education, filed by David Lee Caldwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. U.S. Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?