Doe, et al v. Prince George's County Board of Education, et al
Plaintiff: John Doe #7, John Doe #8 and Jane Doe #11
Defendant: Community Services Foundation Corporation, Prince George's County Board of Education, Deonte Lavell Carraway, Glenreed Affordable, LLC, City of Glenarden, Maryland, Community Services Foundation and Michelle Williams
Case Number: 8:2019cv01368
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the Second Amended Complaint by Glenreed Affordable, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwalb, Brian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jane Doe #11, John Doe #7, John Doe #8.(Bryant, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #50 The City of Glenarden's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/19/2019. (rass, Chambers)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #39 The City of Glenarden's Motion for Leave to File Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal Out of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/19/2019. (rass, Chambers)
June 19, 2019 Filing 50 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by City of Glenarden, Maryland(Karpinski, Kevin)
June 18, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Community Services Foundation Corporation.(Schwinn, D)
June 18, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Glenarden, Maryland.(Karpinski, Kevin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 47 -SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION to Dismiss BOARD OF EDUCATION OF PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Prince George's County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Scott, Andrew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 46 -SEALED-STATE COURT Partial Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment by Prince George's County Board of Education(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Seal DEFENDANT BOARD OF EDUCATION OF PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY'S MOTION TO FILE REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER SEAL by Prince George's County Board of Education (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Scott, Andrew)
June 13, 2019 Filing 44 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Community Services Foundation Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Community Services Foundation Corporation a/k/a Community Services Foundations for Community Services Foundation Corporation.(Schwinn, D)
June 11, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brooks Rynd on behalf of City of Glenarden, Maryland (Rynd, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff S.H. and D.W. should file any relevant motions or noticed within fourteen (14) days of this Memorandum Order regarding Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/10/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court Board of Education of Prince George's County's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Prince George's County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Scott, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE re #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by City of Glenarden, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a)(Karpinski, Kevin)
June 11, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal Out of Time by City of Glenarden, Maryland(Karpinski, Kevin)
June 6, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Jane Doe #11, John Doe #7, John Doe #8. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1)(Prawde, Alyse)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #32 Defendant Glenreed's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Second Amended Complaint (until June 28, 2019). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/3/2019. (rass, Chambers)
June 4, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 10 and 11 to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court by Jane Doe #11, John Doe #7, John Doe #8 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryant, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 35 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit 11 to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court by Jane Doe #11, John Doe #7, John Doe #8 re #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Bryant, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 34 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit 10 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court by Jane Doe #11, John Doe #7, John Doe #8 re #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Bryant, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jane Doe #11, John Doe #7, John Doe #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit to be filed under seal, #11 Exhibit to be filed under seal, #12 Exhibit, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryant, Matthew)
June 3, 2019 Filing 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Second Amended Complaint by Glenreed Affordable, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwalb, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 31 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Glenreed Affordable, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Glenreed Associates LLC, Other Affiliate Glenreed Housing, Inc., Other Affiliate Boston Capital Corporate Tax Credit Fund XXXIV, Other Affiliate BCCC Inc. for Glenreed Affordable, LLC.(Schwalb, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Lawrence Schwalb on behalf of Glenreed Affordable, LLC (Schwalb, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Lawrence Schwalb on behalf of Glenreed Affordable, LLC (Schwalb, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 28 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Prince George's County Board of Education identifying Other Affiliate Prince George's County Risk Management Fund for Prince George's County Board of Education.(Scott, Andrew)
June 3, 2019 Filing 27 QC NOTICE: #22 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Prince George's County Board of Education was filed incorrectly. >**When docketing the Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement the Corporate Parents, Affiliates and parties with a financial interest MUST be entered when prompted by CM/ECF to do so. Please re-file the document correctly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by John Doe #7 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prawde, Alyse)
May 31, 2019 Filing 25 Interim MOTION to Seal by John Doe #7 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prawde, Alyse)
May 31, 2019 Filing 24 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Leave to File, #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Local Rule, 5-15 Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss Second Complaint and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment, #21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by John Doe #7. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit)(Prawde, Alyse)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #21 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendant City of Glenarden's Motion to Dismiss (until June 6, 2019). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte /s/ on 5/30/2019. (rass, Chambers)
May 30, 2019 Filing 22 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Prince George's County Board of Education (Scott, Andrew) Modified on 6/3/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by John Doe #7 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prawde, Alyse)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #18 Plaintiffs' Unoposed Motion to Extend Time by Seven Days for Filing Opposition to Defendant Prince George's County Board of Education's Partial Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment (until May 31, 2019). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/24/2019. (rass, Chambers)
May 23, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Local Rule, 5-15 Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss Second Complaint and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME BY SEVEN DAYS FOR FILING OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BOARD OF EDUCATION OF PRINCE GEORGES COUNTYS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Prince George's County Board of Education.(Williams, Kambon)
May 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Local Rule, 5-15 Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss Second Complaint and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment by Jane Doe #11, John Doe #7, John Doe #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Prawde, Alyse)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kambon Raymond Williams on behalf of Prince George's County Board of Education (Williams, Kambon)
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G Scott on behalf of Prince George's County Board of Education (Scott, Andrew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J O Meally on behalf of Prince George's County Board of Education (O Meally, Edmund)
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Michelle Williams (Foley, Mark)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Michelle Williams.(Foley, Mark)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by City of Glenarden, Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support thereof)(Karpinski, Kevin)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by City of Glenarden, Maryland (Karpinski, Kevin)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Seal ECF 5-14 and ECF 5-15 by City of Glenarden, Maryland(Karpinski, Kevin)
May 13, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (6-9) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MD. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit 1 and Partial Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment by Prince George's County Board of Education re #8 MOTION for Leave to File (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Partial Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment)(rss, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to File Partial Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment and all Related Exhibits Under Seal by Prince George's County Board of Education (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(rss, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/13/2019 to correct filed date (rss, Deputy Clerk).
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 Partial ANSWER to #6 Second Amended Complaint, by Prince George's County Board of Education.(rss, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/13/2019 to correct filed date(rss, Deputy Clerk).
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Deonte Lavell Carraway, City of Glenarden, Maryland, Community Services Foundation Corporation, Glenreed Affordable, LLC, Prince George's County Board of Education, Michelle Williams, filed by John Doe #7, Jane Doe #11, John Doe #8. (Attachments: #1 2nd Amended Complaint Redline Version)(rss, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.5 Corrected (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 7, #7 Attachment 8, #8 Attachment 9, #9 Attachment 10, #10 Attachment 11, #11 Attachment 12, #12 Attachment 13, #13 Attachment 14, #14 Attachment 15, #15 Attachment 16, #16 Attachment 17)(Karpinski, Kevin)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by City of Glenarden, Maryland. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/10/2019. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MD. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR - See ECF No. 5 for Corrected Filing) Local Rule 103.5 (Attachments: #1 Attachment ANSWER FILED BY COMMUNITY SERVICES FOUNDATION CORP., #2 Attachment COMPLAINT, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND LINE REQUESTING SUMMONS., #3 Attachment LINE ENTERING APPEARANCE FOR PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL DAVID M. SIMPSON, #4 Attachment LINE ENTERING APPEARANCE FOR PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FROM jOSEPH, GREENWALD & LAAKE, #5 Attachment LINE ENTERING APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BOARD OF EDUCATION OF PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, #6 Attachment LINE TO ISSUE SUMMONS FOR DEFENDANT COMMUNITY SERVICES FOUNDATION CORP, #7 Attachment PLAINTIFFS' INFORMATION SHEET, #8 Attachment SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE ON DEONTE CARRAWAY, #9 Attachment SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DEFENDANT COMMUNITY SERVICES FOUNDATION CORP., #10 Attachment SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DEFENDANTS, #11 Attachment CERTIFICATION BY CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, #12 Attachment LINE TO ISSUE SUMMONS FOR GLENREED AFFORDABLE, LLC AND CITY OF GLENARDEN, #13 Attachment MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AND PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY BOARD OF EDUCATION OF PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, #14 Attachment PARTIAL ANSWER FILED BY BOARD OF EDUCATION OF PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, #15 Attachment SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, #16 Attachment WRIT OF SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DEFENDANTS GLENREED AFFORDABLE, LLC AND CITY OF GLENARDEN)(Karpinski, Kevin) Modified on 5/13/2019 (rss, Deputy Clerk).
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT in the Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland against Deonte Lavell Carraway, City of Glenarden, Maryland, Community Services Foundation Corporation, Glenreed Affordable, LLC, Prince George's County Board of Education, Michelle Williams, filed by John Doe #7, Jane Doe #11, John Doe #8. (Attachments: #1 Civil - Non-Domestic Case Information Report, #2 Redline Second Amended Complaint)(rss, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland case number CAL19-03969. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8003322), filed by City Of Glenarden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit A3, #5 Exhibit A4, #6 Exhibit A5, #7 Exhibit A6, #8 Exhibit A7, #9 Exhibit A8, #10 Exhibit A9, #11 Exhibit A10, #12 Exhibit A11, #13 Exhibit A12, #14 Exhibit B, #15 Exhibit C)(Karpinski, Kevin) Modified on 5/9/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe, et al v. Prince George's County Board of Education, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Services Foundation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince George's County Board of Education
Represented By: Edmund J O Meally
Represented By: Andrew G Scott
Represented By: Kambon Raymond Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deonte Lavell Carraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenreed Affordable, LLC
Represented By: Brian Lawrence Schwalb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Glenarden, Maryland
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Michael Brooks Rynd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Services Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Williams
Represented By: Mark T Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #7
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #8
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe #11
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?