Lundregan v. Housing Opportunities Commission
Plaintiff: Karen Lundregan
Defendant: Housing Opportunities Commission, Renee Harris, Nowelle Amy Ghahhari, Ethan Dov Cohen, Janice Lindo McDonald, Susie Bell Whittley and Lynn Michelle Hayes
Case Number: 8:2019cv01369
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to the Consent to Exercise Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 7/2/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 31 EMERGENCY MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consent/Declination Form by Karen Lundregan. (Attachments: #1 copy of Case Management Order)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lundregan. Ethan Dov Cohen served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019; Nowelle Amy Ghahhari served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Renee Harris served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019; Lynn Michelle Hayes served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Housing Opportunities Commission served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019; Janice Lindo McDonald served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019; Susie Bell Whittley served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #4 Motion (for a "Surprise Visit" from HUD Representative, from HUD Enforcement Division and/or Office of Inspector General); denying #5 Motion (for Order to Enforce Defendant to Destroy All Records Concerning Plaintiff's Reasonable Accommodation); denying #6 Motion (to Have the Court Request a Representative from Dept of Housing and Urban Development Office of Inspector General and/or Office of Enforcement Division to Review Plaintiff's Case); denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying #8 Motion for the Issuance of Subpoenas for the Production of Documents; denying #9 Motion for the Issuance of Subpoenas for the Production of Documents; denying #10 Motion for the Granting of Amendment to Subpoena for Production of Documents; denying #12 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #13 Motion for Order to Enforce Defendant to Destroy all Records Concerning Plaintiff's Reasonable Accommodation; denying #14 Motion for Subpoena for Additional Production of Documents from Renee Harris; denying #15 Motion to Enforce GAG Order/ Repression Order between all parties; denying #16 Motion for the Issuance of the Attached Subpoenas for the Production of Documents ; denying #21 EMERGENCY MOTION for Injunctive Relief to Block Defendant from Initiating "Termination of Proceedings"; granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Summons; denying #23 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #26 Motion to Waive all Filing fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/26/2019. (bc, Chambers)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/18/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Karen Lundregan or counsel for Karen Lundregan are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/2/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Waive all Filing fees, Photocopying Fees, and Administrative Fees by Karen Lundregan(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 25 Summons Issued 21 days as to Ethan Dov Cohen, Nowelle Amy Ghahhari, Renee Harris, Lynn Michelle Hayes, Housing Opportunities Commission, Janice Lindo McDonald, Susie Bell Whittley.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 24 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Karen Lundregan. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend Name of Defendant by Karen Lundregan (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summons by Karen Lundregan (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 21 EMERGENCY MOTION for Injunctive Relief to Block Defendant from Initiating "Termination of Proceedings" by Karen Lundregan (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 20 Supplement (Complaint Originally filed in Case No. 19-cv-1596) to #1 Complaint filed by Karen Lundregan (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 Supplement (Complaint Originally filed in Case No. 19-cv-1595) to #1 Complaint filed by Karen Lundregan (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Civil Action Nos. 8:19-cv-01595-TJS and 8:19-cv-01596-TJS shall be consolidated with Civil Action Case No. 8:19-cv-01369-TJS ; Granting (2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in case 8:19-cv-01595-TJS; Granting (2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in case 8:19-cv-01596-TJS; Directing the Clerk to close Civil Action Nos. 19-1595 and 19-1596; Granting plaintiff Seven (7) days from the date of this Order in which to complete USM-285 and summons forms; return them to the clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/7/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-cv-01369-TJS, 8:19-cv-01595-TJS, 8:19-cv-01596-TJS(c/m 6/7/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/7/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Karen Lundregan (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document) (heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION Granting the Issuance of the Attached Subpoenas for the Production of Documents by Karen Lundregan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Subpoena Montgomery County Police Dept., #2 Proposed Subpoena Barbara Groshans, #3 Proposed Subpoena Darcel Cox, #4 Proposed Subpoena Ethan Cohen, #5 Proposed Subpoena Frank Vitale, Esq., #6 Proposed Subpoena Patrice Birdsong, #7 Proposed Subpoena Google Hearquarters LLC, #8 Proposed Subpoena Housing Opportunity Commission, #9 Proposed Subpoena John Marshall, Esq., #10 Proposed Subpoena Privacy and Records, #11 Rosie McCray-Moody, #12 Proposed Subpoena Sheriff Darren M. Popkin, #13 Proposed Subpoena Verizon Wireless, #14 Proposed Subpoena Washingtonian Towers Condominiums)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Enforce GAG Order/ Repression Order between all parties by Karen Lundregan(heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Subpoena for Additional Production of Documents from Renee Harris by Karen Lundregan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Subpoena)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Order to Enforce Defendant to Destroy all Records Concerning Plaintiff's Reasonable Accommodation by Karen Lundregan (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend Original Complaint/Statement and Relief in Original Lawsuit by Karen Lundregan (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 [FILED IN ERROR] ORDER directing the Clerk to issue a sealed summons; directing the Clerk to provide summons, copy of the Complaint, completed U.S. Marshal Service of Process Form, and a copy of this Order to the United States Marshal; directing the U.S. Marshal to effectuate service of process. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/28/2019. (c/m 5/29/19 sp2, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/30/2019 (sp2, Deputy Clerk).
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for the Granting of Amendment to Subpoena for Production of Documents by Karen Lundregan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Subpoenas)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for the Issuance of Subpoenas for the Production of Documents by Karen Lundregan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Subpoenas)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for the Issuance of Subpoenas for the Production of Documents by Karen Lundregan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Subpoenas)(Originally received in the Clerk's office on 05/20/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Karen Lundregan.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION (to Have the Court Request a Representative from Dept of Housing and Urban Development Office of Inspector General and/or Office of Enforcement Division to Review Plaintiff's Case) by Karen Lundregan.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION (for Order to Enforce Defendant to Destroy All Records Concerning Plaintiff's Reasonable Accommodation) by Karen Lundregan.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION (for a "Surprise Visit" from HUD Representative, from HUD Enforcement Division and/or Office of Inspector General) by Karen Lundregan.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order and U.S Marshal service of process form to Plaintiff; Granting Plaintiff 21 days to complete and return the Marshal form; Directing the Clerk to issue summons upon receipt of the U.S. Marshal form; Directing the U.S Marshal is directing to effectuate service of process on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 5/13/2019. (c/m/w form 5/13/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Karen Lundregan(rss, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Housing Opportunities Commission, filed by Karen Lundregan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(rss, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundregan v. Housing Opportunities Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Opportunities Commission
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Harris
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nowelle Amy Ghahhari
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Dov Cohen
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Lindo McDonald
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susie Bell Whittley
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Michelle Hayes
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lundregan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?