My Goodness! Games, Inc. v. Willcock
Plaintiff: My Goodness! Games, Inc. and My Goodness! Games, Inc. doing business as Games2U
Consolidated Plaintiff: Loren Andrew Willcock
Consolidated Defendant: My Goodness Games, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01435
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 Transfer Notification Letter (c/m 5/20/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00043. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Transferring Case. Case is transferred to the District of Maryland, Greenbelt Division.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause by Loren Andrew Willcock. (Weatherford, Scott) Modified on 5/1/2019 (afd).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to My Goodness! Games, Inc., Loren Andrew Willcock.( Show Cause Response due by 4/30/2019,), ORDER STAYING all proceedings against Loren Andrew Willcock.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY as to Loren Andrew Willcock . (Weatherford, Scott)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Loren Andrew Willcock as to Loren Andrew Willcock. Waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Weatherford, Scott)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Loren Andrew Willcock. (cj)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by My Goodness! Games, Inc.. (Murray, Martin) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 1/17/2019) (cj).
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Confirm Texas Arbitration Award ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11656155), filed by My Goodness! Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Interim Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit Attorneys Fees Application, #3 Exhibit Final Arbitration Award, #4 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: My Goodness! Games, Inc. v. Willcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Loren Andrew Willcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: My Goodness Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My Goodness! Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My Goodness! Games, Inc. doing business as Games2U
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?