Kerkhof et al v. Brenntag North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carol Kerkhof and Stuart Kerkhof
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., DAP Products Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Kerr Corporation, Whip-Mix Corporation, Dentsply Sirona, Inc., Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Brenntag North America, Inc. and Union Carbide Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01502
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 State Court Acknowledgment Receipt of Remand Notification Letter. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 23 Correspondence to the Circuit Court for Montgomery County re: Remand Letter (c/m 6/4/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER Granting #15 Motion to Remand; Remanding case to the Circuit Court for Montgomery County; Directing Clerk to transmit copies; Directing Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/3/2019. (c/m 6/4/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 21 Correspondence re: enclosing courtesy copies (Ruckdeschel, Jonathan)
May 31, 2019 Filing 20 Supplemental Transmittal re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Carol Kerkhof, Stuart Kerkhof. (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of Motion to Remand and Request for Expedited Consideration)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Carol Kerkhof, Stuart Kerkhof. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14)(Ruckdeschel, Jonathan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)(originally filed in USBC for the District of Maryland on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (11-17) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF MARYLAND. (kns, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/23/2019 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 Submission of Supplemental Authority re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brenntag North America, Inc., Carol Kerkhof, Stuart Kerkhof (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 Correspondence to the Honorable Wendelin I. Lipp from Johathan Ruckdeschel, counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Expedited Consideration by Carol Kerkhof, Stuart Kerkhof (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Appendix of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8-A, #11 Exhibit 8-B, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiffs' Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9027(e)(3). (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Correspondence to the Honorable Wendelin I. Lipp from Kristen S. Eustis, counsel for Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 SDNY Order dated 4/30/2019 signed by Chief Judge McMahon)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-10) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY, MARYLAND. (kns, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/23/2019 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Crossclaim, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 CROSSCLAIM against Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, DAP Products Inc., Georgia-Pacific LLC, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kerr Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Whip-Mix Corporation, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., filed by Dentsply Sirona, Inc.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Crossclaim, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, #6 Crossclaim by Whip-Mix Corporation.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or in the Alternative, Third-Party Complaint against Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, DAP Products Inc., Dentsply Sirona, Inc., Georgia-Pacific LLC, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Whip-Mix Corporation, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., filed by Kerr Corporation.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by DAP Products Inc.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Union Carbide Corporation.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, DAP Products Inc., Dentsply Sirona, Inc., Georgia-Pacific LLC, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kerr Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Whip-Mix Corporation, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., filed by Carol Kerkhof, Stuart Kerkhof.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland, case number 439392-V, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. transmitted from the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Complaint, #2 Attachment 2 - Summons, #3 Attachment 3 - Union Carbide Corporation's Answer, #4 Attachment 4 - DAP Inc.'s Answer, #5 Attachment 5 - Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Joint Answer, #6 Attachment 6 - Kerr Corporation's Cross Claim for Contribution or in the Alternative, Third-Party Complaint, #7 Attachment 7 - Whip-Mix Corporation's Answer, #8 Attachment 8 - Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.'s Answer to Kerr Corporation's Cross Claim/Third Party Complaint, #9 Attachment 9 - Dentsply Sirona, Inc.'s Cross Claim, #10 Attachment 10 - Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.'s Answer to Dentsply Sirona, Inc.'s Cross Claim, #11 Exhibit A - Complaint, #12 Exhibit B - Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Answer to Complaint, #13 Exhibit C - Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy filed in USBC for the District of Delaware, #14 Exhibit D - State Court Docket Sheet, #15 Compact Disc Cover Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2019: #16 AP 19-125 WIL Docket Sheet, #17 Transmittal Sheet, #18 Amended Transmittal Sheet) (kns, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerkhof et al v. Brenntag North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Siracusa Eustis
Represented By: Robin Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP Products Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerr Corporation
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whip-Mix Corporation
Represented By: Jon W Brassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dentsply Sirona, Inc.
Represented By: Terri Lynn Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kristen Siracusa Eustis
Represented By: Robin Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Danielle Grilli Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Kerkhof
Represented By: Jonathan Ruckdeschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Kerkhof
Represented By: Jonathan Ruckdeschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?