TruCorps LLC et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Melvin Duane Stillwell, TruCorps LLC and Direct Opportunities Group LLC
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 8:2019cv01505
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melvin Duane Stillwell, Direct Opportunities Group LLC, TruCorps LLC. United States of America served on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019.(McGrath, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melvin Duane Stillwell, Direct Opportunities Group LLC, TruCorps LLC. United States of America served on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019.(McGrath, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melvin Duane Stillwell, Direct Opportunities Group LLC, TruCorps LLC. United States of America served on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019.(McGrath, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition to Quash served on Premier Bank, Inc. on May 21, 2019, filed by Direct Opportunities Group LLC, Melvin Duane Stillwell, TruCorps LLC.(McGrath, William)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by TruCorps LLC (McGrath, William)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Direct Opportunities Group LLC (McGrath, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Deficiency Notice as to TruCorps LLC and Direct Opportunities Group LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 5/29/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Quash IRS Summons ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0416-8024752), filed by Melvin Duane Stillwell, Direct Opportunities Group LLC, TruCorps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit)(McGrath, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TruCorps LLC et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Duane Stillwell
Represented By: William P McGrath, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TruCorps LLC
Represented By: William P McGrath, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Direct Opportunities Group LLC
Represented By: William P McGrath, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?