SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310 et al

Plaintiff: SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc.
Defendant: Energy Insurance Mutual Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310, Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Limited, Hamilton, Bermuda and Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv01510
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #26 Motion to Stay; actions is STAYED for a period of six (6) months to allow time for the parties to discuss settlement. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/21/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand by SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahalt, Brent)
June 14, 2019 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Stay by SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahalt, Brent)
June 7, 2019 Filing 25 Correspondence re: Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal (Attachments: #1 Standing Order Concerning Removal)(Hebb, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Filing 24 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The SNC-Lavalin Corporation, Corporate Parent SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc., Corporate Parent SNC-Lavalin (GB) Limited, Corporate Parent SNC-Lavalin (GB) Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent WS Atkins Limited, Corporate Parent Atkins International Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Atkins US Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent SNCL-US Holdco 3, Inc. for SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc..(Ahalt, Brent)
June 5, 2019 Filing 23 QC NOTICE: #22 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **When docketing the Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement the Corporate Parents, Affiliates and parties with a financial interest MUST be entered when prompted by CM/ECF to do so. Please re-file the document correctly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 22 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc. (Ahalt, Brent) Modified on 6/5/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
May 30, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310 identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Kiln Group Limited, Corporate Parent Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Kiln Insurance Limited for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310.(Hebb, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 20 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310 identifying Other Affiliate Starstone Insurance SE f/k/a Torus Insurance (UK) Limited for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310.(Hebb, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310 identifying Other Affiliate The Continental Corporation, Other Affiliate Hardy (Underwriting Agencies) Limited, as Managing Agent for Lloyd's Syndicate 382, Other Affiliate Hardy Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate Hardy Underwriting Group Limited for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310.(Hebb, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310 identifying Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Lloyd's Syndicate Talbot Validus Group (, Other Affiliate Talbot 2002 Underwriting Capital Limited, Other Affiliate Validus Holdings, Ltd for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310.(Hebb, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Energy Insurance Mutual Limited identifying Other Affiliate Energy Insurance Services, Inc. for Energy Insurance Mutual Limited.(Hebb, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Allianz SE, Other Affiliate AGCS International Holding B.V. for Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company.(Hebb, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Limited, Hamilton, Bermuda identifying Other Affiliate AEGIS Insurance Services, Inc. for Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Limited, Hamilton, Bermuda.(Hebb, Robert)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/29/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- All Parties - Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed electronically by 6/5/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 Consent to Removal to Federal Court. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Removal, #2 Consent to Removal, #3 Consent to Removal, #4 Consent to Removal, #5 Consent to Removal)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE to Adverse Party (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate Upon Removal and Local Rule 103.5 Certificate.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2 - 10) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT OF PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company, Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Limited, Hamilton, Bermuda, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310 and Energy Insurance Mutual Limited. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, by Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company, Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Limited, Hamilton, Bermuda, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310 and Energy Insurance Mutual Limited.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company, Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Limited, Hamilton, Bermuda, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310 and Energy Insurance Mutual Limited, filed by SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redline First Amended Complaint)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part #3 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Join Necessary Parties; granting Plaintiff 30 days to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mittelstaedt on 3/29/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Signed by Judge Mittelstaedt on 3/29/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Join Necessary Parties by Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company, Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Limited, Hamilton, Bermuda, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310 and Energy Insurance Mutual Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition and Request for Hearing re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Join Necessary Parties by Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company, Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Limited, Hamilton, Bermuda, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310 and Energy Insurance Mutual Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #2 Memorandum in Support) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 State Court Complaint Filed in the Circuit Court of Prince George's County, Maryland against Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company, Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Limited, Hamilton, Bermuda, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310 and Energy Insurance Mutual Limited, filed by SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL18-41733. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637034403), filed by Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company, Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Limited, Hamilton, Bermuda, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310, Energy Insurance Mutual Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 State Docket Sheet, #6 Complaint, #7 Civil Case Information Report, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Affidavit of Service, #13 Affidavit of Service, #14 Affidavit of Service, #15 Affidavit of Service, #16 Motion to Dismiss, #17 Text of Proposed Order, #18 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #19 Text of Proposed Order, #20 Motion for Leave to File, #21 Text of Proposed Order, #22 Order, #23 Order, #24 First Amended Complaint, #25 Stipulation of Extension of Time, #26 Second Stipulation of Extension of Time)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Insurance Mutual Limited
Represented By: Richard J. Medoff
Represented By: Robert Leigh Hebb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. P15UC02310
Represented By: Richard J. Medoff
Represented By: Robert Leigh Hebb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Limited, Hamilton, Bermuda
Represented By: Richard J. Medoff
Represented By: Robert Leigh Hebb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard J. Medoff
Represented By: Robert Leigh Hebb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SNC-Lavalin Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Garrett Sawyer
Represented By: Brent M Ahalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?