Hutchinson v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Katrina Hutchinson
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01551
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 QC NOTICE: #20 Affidavit of Service filed by Katrina Hutchinson was filed incorrectly. **Re-file using the Civil Event - Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on General Motors c/o Corporation Service Company signed by Sheena Kruse on 6/21/2019, filed by Katrina Hutchinson.(Levin, Daniel) Modified on 7/15/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to August 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/10/2019. (lmys, Chambers)
July 5, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by General Motors LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Iannetta, Christie)
July 5, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by General Motors LLC identifying Other Affiliate General Motors Company, Other Affiliate General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors LLC.(Iannetta, Christie)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/5/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christie L Iannetta on behalf of General Motors LLC (Iannetta, Christie)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S Rathod on behalf of Katrina Hutchinson (Rathod, Jason)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A Migliaccio on behalf of Katrina Hutchinson (Migliaccio, Nicholas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Consent to Magistrate Judge. Katrina Hutchinson or Counsel for Katrina Hutchinson must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Migliaccio, Nicholas) Modified on 6/24/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nicholas Elia. Directing attorney Nicholas Elia to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel Levin. Directing attorney Daniel Levin to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 6/7/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Katrina Hutchinson or counsel for Katrina Hutchinson are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/21/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to General Motors LLC.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas Elia (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8057301.) by Katrina Hutchinson(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel C. Levin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8057195.) by Katrina Hutchinson(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
May 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8033946.), filed by Katrina Hutchinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Migliaccio, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchinson v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Hutchinson
Represented By: Nicholas A Migliaccio
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Represented By: Nicholas Elia
Represented By: Jason S Rathod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Christie L Iannetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?