Rodriguez v. Alvarez
Plaintiff: Elmer Rafael Rodriguez
Defendant: Keisi Yuliza Zambrano Alvarez
Case Number: 8:2019cv01552
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Neal Jordan Meiselman (Attachment: #1 Returned Document) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Neal Jordan Meiselman. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 Remand Notification Letter sent to the Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland. (cm/w/cc of Docket Sheet and Remand Order)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (FILED IN ERROR-DUPLICATE) MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER Granting #7 Emergency Motion to Remand; Granting #10 Motion to Accept Defendant's Opposition; Remanding case to the Circuit Court for Prince George's County but retaining jurisdiction over Mr. Rodriguez's claim for costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/5/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #10 MOTION Accept Defendant's Opposition; granting #7 Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION to Remand; remanding this case to the Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland; directing Plaintiff's Counsel to advise the Court within 14 days after the entry of an Order following the emergency hearing by the Circuit Court whether he intends to pursue attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/5/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Elmer Rafael Rodriguez.(Savit, Diana)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION Accept One Day Out of Time re #9 Response to Motion To Accept Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand One Day of Time by Keisi Yuliza Zambrano Alvarez(Richey, Ronald)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Emergency MOTION to Remand Opposition filed by Keisi Yuliza Zambrano Alvarez.(Richey, Ronald)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER DIRECTING Defendant to file a response of 12 pages or less to #7 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand by Monday, June 3, 2019 at 5 p.m., and DIRECTING Plaintiff to file a reply of six pages or less by Tuesday, June 4, 2019 at 5 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/30/2019. (lmys, Chambers)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Elmer Rafael Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Errata C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Errata E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Savit, Diana)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/29/2019. (cm 05/29/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Keisi Yuliza Zambrano Alvarez. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/28/2019. (c/m 5/28/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Correspondence sent to Attorney for the Plaintiff re: Removal Notification Letter. (c/m 5/28/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAD 19-07272. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637115304), filed by Keisi Yuliza Zambrano Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Declaration, #11 Cover Letter)(bas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/28/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Keisi Yuliza Zambrano Alvarez (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Darwin Richey on behalf of Keisi Yuliza Zambrano Alvarez (bas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/28/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Rafael Rodriguez
Represented By: Diana Marjorie Savit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keisi Yuliza Zambrano Alvarez
Represented By: Ronald Darwin Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?