Mann v. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC
Plaintiff: Yisroel Mann
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01613
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER ORDER adopting with modifications (704) Report and Recommendations of Special Master regarding paragraph 11 and Protective Order against subpoenas. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/22/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tina Wolfson Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Wolfson, Tina)
September 28, 2020 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by City of ChicagoAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Richman, Benjamin)
August 21, 2020 Filing 28 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edmund Alves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Verification, #5 Verification)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(O Connell, Andrew) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting (562) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Claiborne Hane terminated in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/7/2020. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-01453-PWG, 8:19-cv-01613-PWG, 8:19-cv-01792-PWG(el2s, Chambers)
March 30, 2020 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT /Joint Status Report by Construction Laborers Pension Trust for Southern CaliforniaAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Villegas, Carol)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Canceling Status Conference. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/16/2020. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 24 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Johnsgard, Amy) Modified on 3/2/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER in Consumer Actions granting in part and denying in part (450) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (451) Motion to Dismiss in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2020 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION in Consumer Actions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2020 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION AND ADDRESS Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Travis, Ben)
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 Correspondence re: Bellwether Selection Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Pizzirusso, James)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying #13 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/25/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 Correspondence re: request to file a motion for leave to file a surreply in opposition to plaintiff Yisroel Manns motion to remand Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-01613-PWG(Keteltas, Gilbert)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DISCOVERY ORDER Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/16/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/16/2019Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re (287 in 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 287 in 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 13 in 8:19-cv-01613-PWG, 13 in 8:19-cv-01613-PWG) MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Alternative Service filed by Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, LLC, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG, 8:19-cv-01613-PWG(Keteltas, Gilbert)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file joint ESI Protocol by Gretchen Ehle (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Friedman, Andrew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION for Alternative Service by Yisroel MannAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Schlachet, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Donna Hiteshew of Withdrawal of Eve Lynn J. Rapp from Consumer Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Rapp, Eve-Lynn)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 Correspondence from Clerk to counsel re: transfer of MDL case. (c/e-m 5/7/19 with ECF 3, 171, 238 and 279 in PWG 19-md-2879 (Order)) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00348. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2879 Marriott International, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. Case transferred to the District Of Maryland and assigned to the Honorable Paul w. Grimm. (P,R)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 2/21/2019.(P,J)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 Opposition to #7 Motion to stay and Request for Ruling on or before March 27, 2019 filed by Yisroel Mann. (Schlachet, Mark)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Stay Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendant Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Of Motion To Stay Pending Action By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation, #2 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit B - Case Management Order, #4 Exhibit C - Notice Of Potential Tag-Along Action)(Warren, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Yisroel Mann. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion)(Schlachet, Mark)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Mars Merger Sub, LLC, Other Affiliate Marriott International, Inc. for Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Warren, Daniel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance of Counsel by Daniel R. Warren and Lisa M. Ghannoum filed by on behalf of Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Warren, Daniel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,SR)
February 15, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,SR)
February 15, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, (S,SR)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV-19-910474 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9150989. Filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-complaint, #3 Exhibit B-docket, #4 Exhibit C-summons, #5 Exhibit D-notice of filing) (Warren, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann v. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Gilbert S Keteltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yisroel Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?