HITT Contracting Inc. v. Glenstone Foundation, Inc.

Plaintiff: HITT Contracting Inc.
Defendant: Glenstone Foundation, Inc.
Respondent: JCM Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01640
Filed: May 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David Brian Wonderlick on behalf of HITT Contracting Inc. (Wonderlick, David)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 Transfer Notification Letter sent to Counsel. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 6/5/19)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:19-mc-00008. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 30, 2019 Case transferred to District of District of Maryland. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (jlan)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Transfer Case. ORDERED that this action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 05/30/2019. (jlan)
May 30, 2019 Per MSN chambers motions set for 5/31/19 have been cancelled (clar, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland by HITT Contracting Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mueller, Rae)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Adam Robbins on behalf of JCM Associates, Inc (Robbins, Seth)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Cloud Spurlock on behalf of Glenstone Foundation, Inc. (Spurlock, Daniel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Francis Fiorill on behalf of Glenstone Foundation, Inc. (Fiorill, Joseph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Glenstone Foundation, Inc.. (Fiorill, Joseph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Opposition to #2 MOTION to Compel Non-Party JCM Associates, Inc.'s Compliance With Subpoena filed by Glenstone Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Fiorill, Joseph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Martin Burke on behalf of HITT Contracting Inc. (Burke, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Nachmanoff. #2 MOTION to Compel Non-Party JCM Associates, Inc.'s Compliance With Subpoena (clar, )
May 28, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Compel Non-Party JCM Associates, Inc.'s Compliance With Subpoena. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (clar, )
May 24, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (jlan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by HITT Contracting Inc.. (Mueller, Rae)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Hearing Date re #2 MOTION to Compel Non-Party JCM Associates, Inc.'s Compliance With Subpoena, #3 Memorandum in Support, (Mueller, Rae)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Compel Non-Party JCM Associates, Inc.'s Compliance With Subpoena filed by HITT Contracting Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian R. Dugdale, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Mueller, Rae)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Compel Non-Party JCM Associates, Inc.'s Compliance With Subpoena by HITT Contracting Inc.. (Mueller, Rae)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Miscellaneous Case HITT Contracting Inc. v. Glenstone Foundation, Inc. - Motion to Compel Non-Party JCM Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0422-6657397.), filed by HITT Contracting Inc..(Mueller, Rae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HITT Contracting Inc. v. Glenstone Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HITT Contracting Inc.
Represented By: David Brian Wonderlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JCM Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Seth A Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenstone Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Francis Fiorill
Represented By: Daniel C Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?