Cofield et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Keenan Kester Cofield, HENRIETTALACKS.COM, HENRIETTA LACKS INJURY CENTER, Keenan Cofield, HENRIETTA LACKS LLC, Berri A. Wells, HENRIETTALACKS.APP, INJURY CENTER OF MD, Dr. Keenan Cofield, Dr. Keenan K. Cofield, Henrietta Lacks and Henrietta Lacks, LLC
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, FHA, U.S. HUD ADMINISTRATION, U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. ATTORNEYS OFFICE, Chris Van Hollen, FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ROBERT K. HUR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Drive Time Automotive Group, Inc., General Motors, LLC, Facebook, Inc., Johns Hopkins Hospital, Inc., Drive Time Auto Sales, U.S. Senator, General Motors Company Complaints, (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, Crown Real Estate, LLC, GoDaddy.com, LLC, Joanne E. Pollak, John Gay Maynard, III, Johns Hopkins Health System Corp., AutoNation Chevrolet - Laurel, Johns Hopkins University, State Farm Insurance, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Corp, Google, Inc., Oscar Diaz, Johns Hopkins Hospital Legal Department, U.S. Congressman, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC, Google, LLC, Drive Time Car Sales Company, LLC, Johnathan J. Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, John's Hopkins Medical Service Corp., Capital One Bank, Geico Casualty Company, Inc., William B. Yang, Twitter, Inc., Reggie Harris State Farm Insurance, US HUD Administration, South County Repair, Inc., National Arbitration Forum, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Bill Ayers Chevrolet, LLC, Law Firm of Maslan, Maslan & Rothwell, P.A., Weicher Realtor, New Colony Realtor, LLC, General Motors Company - Chevrolet Division, Daniel G. Shealer, Jr., Amanda Zorn, ICann - Internet Corporation, Silverrock Automotive Group, Inc. and Lockton Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01644
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 157 NOTICE by John's Hopkins Medical Service Corp., Johns Hopkins Health System Corp., Johns Hopkins Hospital Legal Department, Johns Hopkins Hospital, Inc., Johns Hopkins University Intent to File a Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Chrencik, Lucas)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER that within Ten (10) days from the date of this Order the Plaintiffs shall file an Amended Complaint; withing Fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order the plaintiffs shall file proofs of service showing that all defendants have been served. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/2/2019. (c/m 8/2/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/2/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER directing the individual Plaintiffs to file an Amended Complaint within 10 days; directing the individual Plaintiffs to file proofs of service showing service on all Defendants within 14 days. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/2/2019. (en/cm 8/2/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE by Geico Casualty Company, Inc. Notice of Intent to File a Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Grant, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 153 Return Pleading Letter. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(cm 7/19/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2019 Filing 152 Return Pleading Letter. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(cm 7/29/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2019 Filing 151 Return Pleading Letter. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(cm 7/29/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G Korphage on behalf of Lockton Companies, Inc. (Korphage, Eric)
July 25, 2019 Filing 149 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AutoNation Chevrolet - Laurel, Bill Ayers Chevrolet, LLC identifying Other Affiliate AutoNation, Inc., Other Affiliate Fox Chevrolet, LLC, Other Affiliate AutoNation Enterprises Incorporated, Other Affiliate AN Dealership Holding Corp., Other Affiliate Auto Holding, LLC for AutoNation Chevrolet - Laurel, Bill Ayers Chevrolet, LLC.(Rauch, Lee)
July 25, 2019 Filing 148 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Capital One, Capital One Bank identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One, Capital One Bank.(McNichol, James)
July 25, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick McNichol on behalf of Capital One, Capital One Bank (McNichol, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE of Intent to File a Motion re #25 ORDER, by Keenan K. Cofield AND Berri A. Wells. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 145 NOTICE of Intent to file a Motion by Keenan K. Cofield, Berri A. Wells. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE of Intent to File a Motion by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE of Intent to File a Motion seeking to Withdraw in part #15 NOTICE to Allow Without Objection Any and All Defendants Served or Un-Served the Right for Extension of Time by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 142 Return Pleading Letter. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(cm 07/15/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 141 Return Pleading Letter. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(cm 7/15/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting Plaintiffs Dr. Keenan Cofield and Berry A. Wells 14 days to file an Amended Complaint; granting all Defendants 14 days from the date of the filing of the Amended Complaint to file a Responsive Pleading; denying without prejudice #131 and #139 Notices of Intent; notifying the Institutional Plaintiffs that Counsel must be retained by August 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/11/2019. (cm 07/12/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 139 Correspondence re: Notice of Intent to File a Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment (Duke, Neil)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #137 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/10/2019. (cm 07/10/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 137 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by AutoNation Chevrolet - Laurel, Bill Ayers Chevrolet, LLC, Oscar Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rauch, Lee)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #134 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/9/2019. (en 07/09/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Filing 135 RESPONSE re #11 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Geico Casualty Company, Inc..(Grant, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 134 MOTION for Extension of Time by Geico Casualty Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grant, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 133 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Geico Casualty Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Geico Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Geico General Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Geico Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate GEICO Choice Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GEICO Insurance Agency, Inc., Other Affiliate GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company for Geico Casualty Company, Inc..(Grant, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 132 RESPONSE re #11 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by South County Repair, Inc..(Kestner, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 131 Request for Conference (Attachments: #1 List of served parties)(Kestner, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 130 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by South County Repair, Inc. (Kestner, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Certificate of Service (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 2, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Kestner on behalf of South County Repair, Inc. (Kestner, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Paper Returned as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Civil Case Closure Form as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to FTC as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Bill Ayares Chevrolet LLC as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Plaintiff's Notice to Clerk as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to FCC as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Twitter, Inc. as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to GEICO Casualty Company as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Ace American Insurance Co. as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to South County Auto Repair as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to State of MDOT as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to PG County Permit as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to PG Dept. of Environment Resources as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to PG County Government as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Fidelity as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Lockton Companies LLC as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Colonial American Casualty and Surety as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Zurich as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to National Union Fire Ins. as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Drivetime Automotive Group Inc. as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to 4601 St. Barnabus Road LLC as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to GoDaddy Inc. as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Attachment as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Praecipe as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Notice to Clerk to Issue New Summons as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to General Motors Complaints as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to General Motors Company Complaints as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Praecipre as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to ICANN as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Google Inc. & Google LLC as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to GoDaddy.com as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Google LLC as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Facebook Inc. as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Facebook as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to National Arbitration Forum as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Corporation as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Reggie Harris State Farm Insurance as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Capital One Bank as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Capital One Financial Corporation as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Silverrock Automotive Inc.-Baltimore as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to CSC Lawyers Service Inc. (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Drivetime Carsales Company-Baltimore as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Drivetime Carsales Company as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Drivetime Car Sales as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Silverrock Associates- AZ as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to General Motors LLC as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Cars DB2, LP as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE by Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Oscar Diaz as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to General Motors Company Complaints as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to General Motors as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to General Motors-Chevrolet Division as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Bill Ayares as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Auto Nation Chevrolet-Laurel as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Plaintiff's Notice to Pursuant to MD Rule 2-503b as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Affidavit of Service as to USA as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Affidavit of Service as to US Atty General2 as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Affidavit of Service as to US Atty General1 as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Affidavit of Service as to USAO as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Affidavit of Service as to FBI as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Affidavit of Service as to IRS as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Affidavit of Service as to Hur as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Affidavit of Service as to FHA as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Affidavit of Service as to HUD as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Affidavit of Service as to NIH as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Affidavit of Service as to SSA as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Plaintiff's Notice to Pursuant to MD Rules 2-503b as to Defendant Johns Hopkins as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Plaintiff's Demand for Trial by Jury as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Plaintiff's Third Set of Request for Admissions of Facts as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Johns Hopkins Medical Service Corp as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Johns Hopkins Health System Corp as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Johns Hopkins Hospital Legal Department as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Johns Hopkins Health System Corp as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Johns Hopkins Hospital Inc. as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Johns Hopkins University as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Weicher Realtors New Colony Realtors LLC -Columbia as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Weicher Realtors New Colony Realtors LLC as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Crown Real Estate Inc. Reisterstown as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Crown Real Estate LLC-Pikesville as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC-Baltimore as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC-Elkridge as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Zorn as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Maslan Maslan & Rothwell P.A. as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Yang-Laurel as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to Yang-Elkridge as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Writ of Summons as to USA as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Praecipe as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Communications commission - (FCC), Robert K. Hur, NIH - National Institutes of Health, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen re #33 Local Rule Request for Waiver of Prepaid Costs as filed in State Court (Cusson, Evelyn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 33 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of Remaining State Court Papers(Cusson, Evelyn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 128 Notice of Returns Affidavits of Service with Summons Upon Certain Defendants by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (Attachments: #1 Affidavits of Service for State Court Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 127 Notice and/or Request to Court for Clarification of #10 Case Management Order by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE and/or Request for Court Leave of Court to Amend Required State Defendants by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2019 Filing 32 Return Document Letter. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(cm 06/26/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2019 Filing 30 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by General Motors, LLC identifying Other Affiliate General Motors Company, Other Affiliate General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors, LLC.(Dahl, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE re #11 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by General Motors, LLC.(Dahl, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C Dahl on behalf of General Motors, LLC (Dahl, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil E Duke on behalf of General Motors, LLC (Duke, Neil)
June 25, 2019 Filing 31 Return Document Letter. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(cm 06/26/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 26 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Keenan K. Cofield. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part as moot #3 Motion for Extension of Time; directing the Government to respond to the Amended complaint by August 12, 2019; denying #14 Individual Plaintiffs' Objection; reminding parties to comply with the provisions of #10 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/19/2019. (cm 06/20/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 24 Correspondence re: Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal (Cusson, Evelyn)
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 Praecipe #8 Amended Complaint to Update or Correct Federal Docket and Record from State Court by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 22 Praecipe #7 Amended Complaint to Update or Correct Federal Docket and Record from State Court by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 21 Praecipe #6 Amended Complaint to Update or Correct Federal Docket and Record from State Court by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 20 Praecipe #5 Amended Complaint to Update or Correct Federal Docket and Record from State Court by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 Praecipe #4 Amended Complaint to Update or Correct Federal Docket and Record from State Court by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 Praecipe #3 to Update or Correct Federal Docket and Record from State Court by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 Praecipe #2 to Update or Correct Federal Docket and Record from State Court by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 Praecipe #1 to Update or Correct Federal Docket and Record from State Court by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE to Allow Without Objection Any and All Defendants Served or Un-Served the Right for Extension of Time by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 Objection to Defendants AUSA Draft Order in Part Conflicts with Courts Case Management Order and Request for Extension of Time, Jointly by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Non-Receipt of Documents #10 , #11 and #12 by Keenan K. Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 Removal Notification Letter sent to Pro Se Parties. (cm 06/06/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/6/2019. (cm 06/06/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/4/2019. (cm 06/06/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4 - 9) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to the Clerk by Keenan K. Cofield, Keenan Cofield and Berri A. Wells. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 Third Amended Complaint filed in the Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland against (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, Crown Real Estate, LLC, FHA, Facebook, Inc., Federal Bureau of Investigation, Henrietta Lacks, Henrietta Lacks, LLC, HenriettaLacks.App, HenriettaLacks.com, Robert K. Hur, Injury Center of MD, John's Hopkins Medical Service Corp., Johns Hopkins Health System Corp., Johns Hopkins Hospital Legal Department, Johns Hopkins Hospital, Inc., Johns Hopkins University, Law Firm of Maslan, Maslan & Rothwell, P.A., NIH - National Institutes of Health, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Joanne E. Pollak, Daniel G. Shealer, Jr, Social Security Administration, Twitter, Inc., U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen, Weicher Realtor, New Colony Realtor, LLC, William B. Yang, Amanda Zorn, AutoNation Chevrolet - Laurel, Bill Ayers Chevrolet, LLC, General Motors, LLC, General Motors Company Complaints, Oscar Diaz and General Motors Company - Chevrolet Division, filed by Berri A. Wells, Keenan K. Cofield and Keenan Cofield.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Keenan K. Cofield, Keenan Cofield and Berri A. Wells(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 Second Amended Complaint filed in the Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland against (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, Crown Real Estate, LLC, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert K. Hur, John's Hopkins Medical Service Corp., Johns Hopkins Health System Corp., Johns Hopkins Hospital Legal Department, Johns Hopkins Hospital, Inc., Johns Hopkins University, Law Firm of Maslan, Maslan & Rothwell, P.A., NIH - National Institutes of Health, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Joanne E. Pollak, Daniel G. Shealer, Jr, Social Security Administration, Twitter, Inc., U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen, Weicher Realtor, New Colony Realtor, LLC, William B. Yang, Amanda Zorn and Facebook, Inc., filed by HenriettaLacks.com, Berri A. Wells, Injury Center of MD, Henrietta Lacks, LLC, Keenan K. Cofield, Henrietta Lacks, HenriettaLacks.App and Keenan Cofield.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Complaint filed in the Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland against (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, Crown Real Estate, LLC, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert K. Hur, John's Hopkins Medical Service Corp., Johns Hopkins Health System Corp., Johns Hopkins Hospital Legal Department, Johns Hopkins Hospital, Inc., Johns Hopkins University, Law Firm of Maslan, Maslan & Rothwell, P.A., NIH - National Institutes of Health, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Joanne E. Pollak, Daniel G. Shealer, Jr, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen, Weicher Realtor, New Colony Realtor, LLC, William B. Yang, Amanda Zorn and Twitter, Inc., filed by HenriettaLacks.com, Berri A. Wells, Injury Center of MD, Henrietta Lacks, LLC, Keenan K. Cofield, Henrietta Lacks, HenriettaLacks.App and Keenan Cofield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 State Court Complaint filed in the Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland against (IRS) Internal Revenue Service, Crown Real Estate, LLC, FHA, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert K. Hur, John's Hopkins Medical Service Corp., Johns Hopkins Health System Corp., Johns Hopkins Hospital Legal Department, Johns Hopkins Hospital, Inc., Johns Hopkins University, Law Firm of Maslan, Maslan & Rothwell, P.A., NIH - National Institutes of Health, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Joanne E. Pollak, Daniel G. Shealer, Jr, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorneys Office, U.S. Congressman, U.S. Senator, US HUD Administration, United States of America, Chris Van Hollen, Weicher Realtor, New Colony Realtor, LLC, William B. Yang and Amanda Zorn, filed by HenriettaLacks.com, Berri A. Wells, Injury Center of MD, Henrietta Lacks, LLC, Keenan K. Cofield, Henrietta Lacks, HenriettaLacks.App and Keenan Cofield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, FHA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, ROBERT K. HUR, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. ATTORNEYS OFFICE, U.S. HUD ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Chris Van Hollen (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of State Court Papers(Cusson, Evelyn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland for Prince George's County, case number CAL19-13374., filed by U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. HUD ADMINISTRATION, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, FHA, ROBERT K. HUR, U.S. ATTORNEYS OFFICE, Chris Van Hollen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Writ of Summons to USA as filed in State Court, #3 Exhibit 2 - Writ of Summons to USAO as filed in State Court, #4 Exhibit 3 - Writ of Summons to US Attorney General as filed in State Court, #5 Exhibit 4 - Writ of Summons to US Attorney General as filed in State Court, #6 Exhibit 5 - Writ of Summons to USAO as filed in State Court, #7 Exhibit 6 - Writ of Summons to FBI as filed in State Court, #8 Exhibit 7 - Writ of Summons to IRS as filed in State Court, #9 Exhibit 8 - Writ of Summons to Robert K. Hur as filed in State Court, #10 Exhibit 9 - Writ of Summons to FHA as filed in State Court, #11 Exhibit 10 - Writ of Summons to HUD as filed in State Court, #12 Exhibit 11 - Writ of Summons to NIH as filed in State Court, #13 Exhibit 12 - Writ of Summons to SSA as filed in State Court, #14 Exhibit 13 - Writ of Summons to Chris Van Hollen Senator as filed in State Court, #15 Exhibit 14 - Information Sheet as filed in State Court, #16 Exhibit 15 - Complaint as filed in State Court, #17 Complaint - Ex 1 as filed in State Court, #18 Complaint - Ex 2 as filed in State Court, #19 Complaint - Ex 3 as filed in State Court, #20 Complaint - Ex A as filed in State Court, #21 Complaint - Ex E as filed in State Court, #22 Complaint - Ex 4 as filed in State Court, #23 Complaint - Ex 5 as filed in State Court, #24 Complaint - Ex 6 as filed in State Court, #25 Exhibit 16 - service copy Cofield CAE19-13374 as filed in State Court, #26 Exhibit 17 - Plaintiffs Demand for Trial by Jury as filed in State Court, #27 Amended Complaint as filed in State Court, #28 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint as filed in State Court, #29 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint as filed in State Court, #30 Exhibit 19 - Amended and Updated Notice to Clerk as filed in State Court, #31 Exhibit 20 - Amended Complaint as filed in State Court, #32 Exhibit 21 - Motion for Summary Judgment as filed in State Court, #33 Exhibit 22 - Notice to Clerk as filed in State Court, #34 Exhibit 23 - Notice to Clerk as filed in State Court, #35 Exhibit 24 - Plaintiff's Notice as filed in State Court, #36 Exhibit 25 - Notice to Clerk as filed in State Court, #37 Exhibit 26 - Notice to Clerk as filed in State Court, #38 Exhibit 27 - Amended Complaint as filed in State Court, #39 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Cusson, Evelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cofield et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keenan Kester Cofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRIETTALACKS.COM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRIETTA LACKS INJURY CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keenan Cofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRIETTA LACKS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berri A. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRIETTALACKS.APP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INJURY CENTER OF MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Keenan Cofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Keenan K. Cofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrietta Lacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrietta Lacks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FHA
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. HUD ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ATTORNEYS OFFICE
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Van Hollen
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT K. HUR
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drive Time Automotive Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Neil E Duke
Represented By: Christopher C Dahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johns Hopkins Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drive Time Auto Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Senator
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company Complaints
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (IRS) Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne E. Pollak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gay Maynard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johns Hopkins Health System Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoNation Chevrolet - Laurel
Represented By: Lee Bryan Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johns Hopkins University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Diaz
Represented By: Lee Bryan Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johns Hopkins Hospital Legal Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Congressman
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Communications commission - (FCC)
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drive Time Car Sales Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan J. Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One
Represented By: James Patrick McNichol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John's Hopkins Medical Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank
Represented By: James Patrick McNichol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company, Inc.
Represented By: David E C Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reggie Harris State Farm Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US HUD Administration
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South County Repair, Inc.
Represented By: David W Kestner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Arbitration Forum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIH - National Institutes of Health
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Ayers Chevrolet, LLC
Represented By: Lee Bryan Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm of Maslan, Maslan & Rothwell, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weicher Realtor, New Colony Realtor, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company - Chevrolet Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel G. Shealer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Zorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICann - Internet Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverrock Automotive Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockton Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Eric G Korphage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?