Patel v. Mukunda et al
Plaintiff: Dimple Patel
Defendant: India Globalization Capital, Inc., Shajy Mathilakathu, Richard Prins, Claudia Grimaldi, Sudhakar Shenoy, Ram Mukunda and Rohit Goel
Case Number: 8:2019cv01673
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: All Defendants must file their answers or otherwise respond to the complaint by August 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/9/2019. (lmys, Chambers)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, as to all Defendants by Rohit Goel, Claudia Grimaldi, Shajy Mathilakathu, Ram Mukunda, Richard Prins, Sudhakar Shenoy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Feinberg, Matthew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Dimple Patel.(Radding, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #6 Affidavit filed by Dimple Patel was filed using the wrong docketing event. **Re-file using the Civil Event - Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Certified Mail by Dimple Patel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Card)(Radding, Andrew) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Melissa A Fortunato. Directing attorney Melissa A Fortunato to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 6/14/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melissa A. Fortunato (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8065593.) by Dimple Patel(Radding, Andrew)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motins. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/10/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Rohit Goel, Claudia Grimaldi, India Globalization Capital, Inc., Shajy Mathilakathu, Ram Mukunda, Richard Prins and Sudhakar Shenoy.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2019 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0416-8056005(Radding, Andrew)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dimple Patel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Signed Verification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons, #7 Summons Summons, #8 Summons Summons, #9 Summons Summons, #10 Summons Summons, #11 Summons Summons)(Radding, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. Mukunda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: India Globalization Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shajy Mathilakathu
Represented By: Matthew Edward Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Prins
Represented By: Matthew Edward Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Grimaldi
Represented By: Matthew Edward Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sudhakar Shenoy
Represented By: Matthew Edward Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ram Mukunda
Represented By: Matthew Edward Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohit Goel
Represented By: Matthew Edward Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimple Patel
Represented By: Andrew Radding
Represented By: Melissa A Fortunato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?