Boger v. Prime Leads Network, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Dan Boger
Defendant: Prime Leads Network, LLC, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, Joseph Giguere Insurance Agency, Inc., Daniel Devine dba The Devine Group and The Devine Group
Case Number: 8:2019cv01681
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Francis X. Nolan, IV by Allstate Insurance Company. The fee has already been paid.(Wiener, Lewis)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Allstate Insurance Company needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Francis X. Nolan, IV (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8152085.) by Allstate Insurance Company(Wiener, Lewis)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Matthew McCue. Directing attorney Matthew McCue to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 7/15/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew P. McCue (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8119536.) by Dan Boger(Ring, Stephen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis Steven Wiener on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Wiener, Lewis)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dan Boger. Allstate Insurance Company waiver sent on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019.(Ring, Stephen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Allstate Insurance Company, Joseph Giguere Insurance Agency, Inc., Prime Leads Network, LLC and The Devine Group. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dan Boger. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Prime Leads, #2 Summons to Devine Group, #3 Summons to Joseph Giguere Ins Agency, #4 Summons to Allstate Ins Co, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ring, Stephen)
June 6, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0416-8057420. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boger v. Prime Leads Network, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Leads Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Lewis Steven Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Giguere Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Devine dba The Devine Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Devine Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Boger
Represented By: Stephen Howard Ring
Represented By: Matthew McCue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?