Jackson v. American Service Insurance Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Linda J. Jackson
3Rd Party Plaintiff: American Service Insurance Company, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Charles Manuel Kea
Case Number: 8:2019cv01695
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Rosenberg, Eric)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued 21 days as to Charles Manuel Kea. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by American Service Insurance Company, Inc. re #12 Third Party Complaint Summons on a Third-Party Complaint (Rice, Heather)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 Third Party THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Charles Manuel Kea, filed by American Service Insurance Company, Inc..(Rice, Heather)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Correspondence re: Statement Concerning Removal (Rice, Heather)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Linda J. Jackson (Rosenberg, Eric)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American Service Insurance Company, Inc. (Rice, Heather)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint of Plaintiff by American Service Insurance Company, Inc..(Rice, Heather)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/7/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.5 Certificate by Defendant.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN STATE COURT by American Service Insurance Company, Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Writ of Summons Issued 60 days as to American Service Insurance Company, Inc.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against American Service Insurance Company, Inc., filed by Linda J. Jackson.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL19-13787, filed by American Service Insurance Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637115746) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(dass, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. American Service Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda J. Jackson
Represented By: Eric F Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: American Service Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Ann Rice
Represented By: Andrew T Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Charles Manuel Kea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?