Freeman v. Beverly et al

Plaintiff: Charles A. Freeman
Defendant: Theresa Beverly and Katherine Holmes
Case Number: 8:2019cv01784
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Supplemental to #1 Complaint filed by Charles A. Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Proof of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Brian E. Frosh, US Attorney's Office, Katherine Holmes, US Attorney General and Theresa Beverly, filed by Charles A. Freeman.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence from Charles Freeman regarding #2 Motion to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Brian Frosh.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 60 days as to Theresa Beverly, Katherine Holmes, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to submit completed summons to the Clerk; directing the Clerk to issue and return summons and any service copies to Plaintiff; denying #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/28/2019. (c/m with blank summons forms 6/28/2019 tds, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Return Document Letter. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(cm 06/20/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay by Charles A. Freeman.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Theresa Beverly and Katherine Holmes ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637034547.), filed by Charles A. Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Beverly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Beverly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?