Artiga v. Skill Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Artiga
Defendant: Skill Services LLC, Priority Care Cleaning LLC and Liliane Lima
Case Number: 8:2019cv01827
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MARGINAL ORDER approving #9 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/1/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Guadalupe Artiga (Kurzyna, Mariusz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guadalupe Artiga. Liliane Lima served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019.(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guadalupe Artiga. Priority Care Cleaning LLC served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019.(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guadalupe Artiga. Skill Services LLC served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019.(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 6/24/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Guadalupe Artiga or counsel for Guadalupe Artiga are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/8/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Liliane Lima, Priority Care Cleaning LLC, and Skill Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8083822.), filed by Guadalupe Artiga. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Skill Services LLC, #3 Summons Priority Care Cleaning LLC, #4 Summons Liliane Lima)(Kurzyna, Mariusz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artiga v. Skill Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skill Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Care Cleaning LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liliane Lima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Artiga
Represented By: Mariusz Kurzyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?