Rawles v. Prince George's County Public Schools

Plaintiff: Melvin Rawles
Defendant: Prince George's County Public Schools
Case Number: 8:2019cv01828
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983ed
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 Discovery Policy Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 8/12/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 8/12/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 7/26/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 Request for Hearing. Prince George's County Public Schools must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 (FILED IN ERROR) Request for Hearing Consent to Exercise Of Jurisdiction By United States Magistrate Judge (Thomas, Roger) Modified on 7/26/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Prince George's County Public Schools or counsel for Prince George's County Public Schools are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/5/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Prince George's County Public Schools (Thomas, Roger)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant, Prince George's County Board of Education's, Answer to Complaint by Prince George's County Public Schools.(Thomas, Roger)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #8 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 7/17/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Melvin Rawles to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/30/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Melvin Rawles files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 7/17/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melvin Rawles. Prince George's County Public Schools served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019.(Tucker, Charles)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #5 Affidavit of Service filed by Melvin Rawles was filed incorrectly. **Wrong event selected. Please use the event Summons Returned Executed so that the answer due date is automatically populated into the docket textIt has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Prince George's County Public Schools on July 3, 2019, filed by Melvin Rawles.(Tucker, Charles) Modified on 7/15/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 7/2/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Melvin Rawles or counsel for Melvin Rawles are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/16/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Prince George's County Public Schools.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prince George's County Public Schools ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8083860.), filed by Melvin Rawles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Tucker, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawles v. Prince George's County Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince George's County Public Schools
Represented By: Roger Cole Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Rawles
Represented By: Charles Tucker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?