Navigators Insurance Company v. Gables Construction, Inc.

Plaintiff: Navigators Insurance Company
Defendant: Gables Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01846
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Navigators Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent The Navigators Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Navigators Specialty Insurance Company for Navigators Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Geiser, James)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/24/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Deficiency Notice as to Navigators Insurance Company -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 7/1/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Gables Construction, Inc. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gables Construction, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8085920.), filed by Navigators Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons)(Geiser, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navigators Insurance Company v. Gables Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gables Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navigators Insurance Company
Represented By: James Henry Geiser, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?